United States of America v. Aguinaldo et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Imelda S. Aguinaldo and Eddie V. Aguinaldo
Case Number: 1:2020cv00434
Filed: October 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2020 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Eddie V. Aguinaldo served on 11/22/2020. (Hoenig, Isaac)
November 25, 2020 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Imelda S. Aguinaldo served on 11/22/2020. (Hoenig, Isaac)
November 19, 2020 Filing 15 EO: By the request of the Government, to allow more time to serve the defendants, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/07/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 01/06/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Until further notice, for all hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
November 17, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Scheduling Conference to Allow Service of the Summons and Complaint on the Defendants Jeremy N. Hendon appearing for Plaintiff United States of America (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support)(Hendon, Jeremy)
October 20, 2020 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to Imelda S. Aguinaldo (jo)
October 20, 2020 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Eddie V. Aguinaldo (jo)
October 20, 2020 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Hoenig, Isaac)
October 15, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00434 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 14, 2020 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
October 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Imelda S. Aguinaldo (jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Eddie V. Aguinaldo (jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 12/7/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00434 KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
October 9, 2020 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Hoenig, Isaac)
October 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoenig, Isaac)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Aguinaldo et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Imelda S. Aguinaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eddie V. Aguinaldo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Represented By: Isaac M. Hoenig
Represented By: Jeremy N. Hendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?