ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust v. Paradise Beverages, Inc.
Plaintiff: ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust
Defendant: Paradise Beverages, Inc., Doe Trusts 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00453
Filed: October 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 28:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 10, 2020 Filing 13 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/21/2020 IS CONTINUED TO 01/13/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 01/06/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00453 SOM -KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 1, 2020 Filing 11 EO: In light of the #9 Request for Entry of Default, the Court directs the Clerks Office to reassign this case to a District Judge. Judge Mansfield will remain as the Magistrate Judge. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
December 1, 2020 Filing 10 ENTRY OF DEFAULT Against Paradise Beverages, Inc. re ECF No. #9 . (emt, )
November 30, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Entry of Default by ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jared N. Kawashima, #2 (Proposed) Entry of Default)(Kawashima, Jared)
November 12, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust. Paradise Beverages, Inc. served on 11/2/2020. (Kawashima, Jared)
October 27, 2020 Filing 7 Consent Election Form
October 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction) While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice ismandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) days after entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
October 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/21/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Paradise Beverages, Inc. (emt, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00453 KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
October 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Summons against Paradise Beverages, Inc., a Hawaii corporation (Filing fee $ 400; Receipt #0975-2438691), filed by ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kawashima, Jared) Modified on 10/22/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust v. Paradise Beverages, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paradise Beverages, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Trusts 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ILWU Local 142 (General) Health and Welfare Trust
Represented By: Jared N. Kawashima
Represented By: Christin D. W. Kawada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?