Caldarone v. Caldarone et al
Plaintiff: Richard W. Caldarone
Defendant: Ronald L. Caldarone, Dave Strachman and George M. Capello
Case Number: 1:2020cv00472
Filed: November 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 29, 2020 Filing 11 EO: In light of #10 MOTION TO CONTINUE COURT DATE filed by Plaintiff Richard W. Calderone on 12/22/2020, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/04/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 02/04/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 01/28/2021. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030 Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(mansfield1)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue Court Date - by Plaintiff Richard W. Caldarone. (jni)
November 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR RECUSAL re #8 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/24/2020. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Richard Caldarone served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 25, 2020.
November 19, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Recusal - by Plaintiff Richard W. Caldarone. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(emt, )
November 5, 2020 Filing 7 EO: On November 3, 2020, Plaintiff Richard Caldarone filed a complaint along with a motion for an injunction. Dkt. Nos. 1, 2. Together, these documents appear to ask this Court to immediately stay probate proceedings in a Rhode Island state court. See Dkt. 1 at 3 ("A motion for injunction will be filed against this whole proceeding."); Dkt. No. 2 at 1 ("it is of utmost importance that a Motion for an Injunction be carried out immediately!"). "A court of the United States may not grant an injunction to stay proceedings in a State court except as expressly authorized by Act of Congress, or where necessary in aid of its jurisdiction, or to protect or effectuate its judgments." 28 U.S.C. 2283. As none of these exceptions apply here, Plaintiff's motion for an injunction, Dkt. No. 2, is DENIED. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF)
November 5, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 7 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction has been served by First Class Mail to Richard W. Caldarone at the address of record on November 5, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (tyk)
November 4, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, ) Modified on 11/4/2020 Civil Waiver of Service Packet mailed to Richard W. Caldarone on November 4, 2020. A blank summons form was included in the mailing to Mr. Caldarone. (emt, ).
November 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/4/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements)(emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Richard W. Caldarone served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on November 4, 2020. (emt, ).
November 4, 2020 ADVISORY ENTRY. Personal Identifiers - Please be advised that exhibits submitted in support of Document #2 MOTION for an Injunction filed by Richard W. Caldarone, contains personal identifiers. To comply with the policy of the Judicial Conference of the United States and the E-Government Act of 2002, and to promote electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy and other legitimate interests, parties shall refrain from including or shall partially redact when inclusion is necessary. (emt, )
November 4, 2020 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry-Personal Identifiers has been served by First Class Mail to Richard W. Caldarone at the address of record on November 4, 2020. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (emt, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number HI029561 re #1 Complaint (emt, )
November 3, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for an Injunction - by Plaintiff Richard W. Caldarone. (Attachments: #1 Last Will and Testament of William Angelo and Gilda Caldarone, #2 Title Search, #3 news articles and death certificates (RESTRICTED to the court and case participants) , #4 Emails from Ronald Caldarone)(emt, ) Modified on 11/4/2020 (emt, ).
November 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Richard W. Caldarone. (Attachments: #1 Letter from Richard W. Caldarone, dated August 25, 2020, #2 Affidavit of Richard W. Caldarone, #3 Mailing Documentation)(emt, ) Modified on 11/4/2020 Filing fee: ECF No. #3 $ 400, receipt number HI029561 re #1 Complaint (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Caldarone v. Caldarone et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard W. Caldarone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald L. Caldarone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dave Strachman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George M. Capello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?