Kehano v. Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Plaintiff: Ralph I. Kehano, Jr.
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd., Doe Partnerships 1-5, Doe Corporations 1-5, John Does 1-5, Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5, Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5 and Jane Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2020cv00486
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 23, 2020 Filing 18 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Ralph I. Kehano, Jr. (Healy, Michael)
December 22, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. Amended Certificate of Service (Re: Defendant Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures) (Gitter, Jennifer)
December 21, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (Re: Defendant Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.'s Initial Disclosures) (Gitter, Jennifer)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 12/14/2020. (emt, )
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 12/14/2020. (emt, )
December 14, 2020 Filing 13 EO: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCETelephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to beissued. Non-Jury Trial is set for 12/13/2021 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/2/2021 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 8/18/2021 12:00 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/14/2021. Discovery due by 10/15/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
December 8, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting; Certificate of Service. (Gitter, Jennifer)
December 8, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.'s Scheduling Conference Statement ; Certificate of Service. (Gitter, Jennifer) Modified on 12/10/2020 (emt, ).
December 7, 2020 Filing 10 Plaintiff Ralph I. Kehano, Jr.'s Scheduling Conference Statement . (Healy, Michael) Modified on 12/8/2020 (emt, ).
December 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00486 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 1, 2020 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco Property Company LLC for Aloha Petroleum, Ltd... (Gitter, Jennifer)
November 14, 2020 Filing 6 Consent Election Form
November 10, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; Case: 1CCV200002180 (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS), #2 Case Detail Docket List) (jo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 12/14/2020 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statement) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
November 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00486 WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-19-0002180. ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2446243), filed by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jennifer L. Gitter, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gitter, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kehano v. Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: Jennifer L. Gitter
Represented By: John L. Knorek
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Agencies 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Non-Profit Organizations 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph I. Kehano, Jr.
Represented By: Charles H. Brower
Represented By: Michael P. Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?