Performance Solutions, LLC v. Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.
Plaintiff: Performance Solutions, LLC, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc. and 321 Holdings
Defendant: Ronald B. Johnson and Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00498
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1126
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 18, 2021 Filing 27 REPORT of Planning Meeting [Joint]. (Hoftiezer, David)
January 18, 2021 Filing 26 Scheduling Conference Statement [Plaintiffs Performance Solutions, LLC, 321 Holdings, and Halcyon Brand Services, Inc.]. (Hoftiezer, David)
January 15, 2021 Filing 25 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SCOTT M. LOWRY re #18 , #22 , #23 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/15/2021. (emt, )
January 15, 2021 Filing 23 Amended Declaration re #22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry AMENDED Filing fee $ 300. . (Monlux, Nicholas)
January 14, 2021 Filing 22 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry AMENDED Filing fee $ 300.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 11, 2021 Filing 21 EO: On 1/8/21, a Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ECF #18 for attorney Scott M. Lowry was filed. The declaration of counsel [18-1] attached to the Motion is incomplete. Counsel must answer question no. 6, which requires the designation of a local, associate counsel. Counsel is directed to file an amended Motion that answers question no. 6 and indicates the name of local counsel (in addition to the name of the local law firm) by no later than 1/18/21. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 8, 2021 Filing 20 Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint with Jury Demand , Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s COUNTERCLAIMS against 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC by Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Defendant Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.'s Counterclaims, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Demand for Jury Trial, #40 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David) Modified on 1/11/2021 (emt, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 19 Defendant Ronald B. Johnson's ANSWER to #1 Plaintiffs' Complaint with Jury Demand by Ronald B. Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 Certificate of Service)(Louie, David) Modified on 1/11/2021 (emt, ).
January 8, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Scott M. Lowry Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2469458.Nicholas R. Monlux appearing for Defendants Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Scott M. Lowry)(Monlux, Nicholas)
January 8, 2021 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.. (Monlux, Nicholas)
December 22, 2020 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC re #13 Errata [Amended COS] (Hoftiezer, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Solutions, LLC, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., 321 Holdings. Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. served on 12/3/2020. (Hoftiezer, David)
December 10, 2020 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Performance Solutions, LLC, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., 321 Holdings. Ronald B. Johnson served on 12/3/2020. (Hoftiezer, David)
December 4, 2020 Filing 13 Errata to Plaintiffs' Complaint [ECF 1] and Exhibit D Thereto [ECF 1-4]. (Hoftiezer, David)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VIE AS TO SASHA G. RAO re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/27/2020. (emt, )
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ASHE P. PURI re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 11/27/2020. (emt, )
November 25, 2020 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Sasha G. Rao Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2453244.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Plaintiff Performance Solutions, LLC (Munger, Lisa)
November 25, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Ashe P. Puri Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2453233.Lisa W. Munger appearing for Plaintiff Performance Solutions, LLC (Munger, Lisa)
November 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa W. Munger on behalf of 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC on behalf of 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Munger, Lisa)
November 20, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Ronald B. Johnson, Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc. (jo)
November 20, 2020 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons) (jo)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 1/25/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 11/20/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo From the Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
November 20, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00498 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC [Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark] 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc., Performance Solutions, LLC. (Hoftiezer, David)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT [Against Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.; Ronald B. Johnson] against All Plaintiffs Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0975-2450882.), filed by Performance Solutions, LLC, 321 Holdings, Halcyon Brand Services, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O, #16 Exhibit P, #17 Exhibit Q, #18 Exhibit R, #19 Exhibit S, #20 Exhibit T, #21 Exhibit U, #22 Exhibit V, #23 Exhibit W, #24 Exhibit X, #25 Exhibit Y, #26 Exhibit Z, #27 Exhibit AA, #28 Exhibit BB, #29 Exhibit CC, #30 Exhibit DD, #31 Exhibit EE, #32 Demand for Jury Trial, #33 Summons, #34 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Hoftiezer, David) Modified on 11/20/2020 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Performance Solutions, LLC v. Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Performance Solutions, LLC
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Represented By: Sasha G. Rao
Represented By: Ashe P. Puri
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Halcyon Brand Services, Inc.
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: 321 Holdings
Represented By: David J. Hoftiezer
Represented By: Lisa W. Munger
Represented By: Calvin E. Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald B. Johnson
Represented By: Scott M. Lowry
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Represented By: David M. Louie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ron Johnson Engineering, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Lowry
Represented By: David M. Louie
Represented By: Nicholas R. Monlux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?