Moises v. Par Pacific Holdings, Inc.
Plaintiff: Aaron Moises
Defendant: Par Pacific Holdings, Inc., Careonsite, Inc. and Patrick Lam
Case Number: 1:2020cv00533
Filed: December 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 29, 2021 Filing 13 EO: The hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is SET for 3/19/21 at 9:00 AM before DISTRICT JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition is due 2/12/21, Reply due 2/19/21. The hearing will be conducted by video teleconference (VTC). The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court.All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-3207.2. Enter your Access Code (1607265019) The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. (shm)
January 28, 2021 Filing 12 EO: Court VACATES the Motion Hearing set for ECF #8 MOTION to Remand set for 3/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 28, 2021 Filing 11 Errata re 9 Link,, #8 MOTION to Remand and Certificate of Service . (Amaguin, Roman)
January 28, 2021 Filing 10 EO: #8 MOTION to Remand - Motion Hearing is set for 3/11/2021 at 11:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Court CONTINUES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/19/2021 to 4/21/2021 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Both the Motion Hearing on 3/11/2021 and the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference on 4/21/2021 will be held telephonically. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 EO: Plaintiff filed a #8 Motion to Remand. Although Plaintiff indicates that the parties engaged in a Local Rule 7.8 conference, he has not complied with the Court's General Civil Case Procedures, which requires counsel for the movant to "include with the motion a statement indicating the date, duration, and communication method of the conference and the participants in the conference." The statement must additionally "detail the issues discussed and resolved during the conference and the issues remaining." Plaintiff is directed to file a statement complying with these requirements by 2/1/21.(JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
January 28, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand and Certificate of Service Roman F. Amaguin appearing for Plaintiff Aaron Moises (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B)(Amaguin, Roman)
December 28, 2020 Filing 7 EO: Per Defendant's request and Plaintiff's agreement, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/4/2021 is CONTINUED to 2/19/2021 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
December 8, 2020 Filing 5 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
December 7, 2020 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV200001603. (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS)) (emt, )
December 4, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Par Pacific Holdings, Inc.. (Mackey, John)
December 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00 AM on 1/4/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
December 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00533 JAO-RT on all further pleadings.
December 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Par Pacific Holdings, Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-20-0001603. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2456578), filed by Par Pacific Holdings, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Certificate of Service)(Mackey, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moises v. Par Pacific Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pacific Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: John S. Mackey
Represented By: Ashley C. Chinen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Careonsite, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Moises
Represented By: Roman F. Amaguin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?