Rowan et al v. Ditamore et al
Plaintiff: Frank Rowan and Karina Rowan
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10, Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Kevin Ditamore, Doe Corporations 1-10, Ayumi Ditamore and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2020cv00543
Filed: December 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1442
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 23 Return of Service on Subpoena Kauai Seascape Nursery, Inc. was served on 01/13/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 22 Return of Service on Subpoena Kauai Restoration was served on 01/13/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 21 Return of Service on Subpoena B&G Pacific, Inc. was served on 01/13/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 20 Return of Service on Subpoena Cascade Joinery was served on 02/03/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 19 Return of Service on Subpoena DCI Engineers was served on 02/03/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 5, 2021 Filing 18 Return of Service on Subpoena DCI Engineers/Beaudette Consulting Engineers, Inc. was served on 02/03/2021 (Ferry, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan re: Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories [DCI Engineers] (Ferry, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan re: Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories [Cascade Joinery] (Ferry, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan re: Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories [DCI Engineers/Beaudette] (Ferry, John)
February 1, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan re: Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories [Greg Robinson] (Ferry, John)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 1/11/2021. (jo)
January 11, 2021 Filing 12 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Plaintiffs do not intend to seek remand, but may join additional parties if settlement efforts are unsuccessful. Parties amenable to early settlement discussions following required discovery.Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 04/27/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 4/19/2022 at 09:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/8/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/1/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER.Confidential Settlement Conference statements due 1/25/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 4/27/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 11/17/2021. Discovery due by 2/18/2022. (ATT / 9:05 - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa, ) (Main Document 12 replaced on 1/11/2021) (laa, ).
January 7, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY: Please be advised docket entries #9 , #10 , and #11 Certificates of Service filed by Karina Rowan, Frank Rowan contain an incorrect case number. The correct case number is: CIVIL NO. 20-00543 JMS-RT. Please include this information on all future filings. No further action necessary. (jo)
January 7, 2021 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan Re: Notice of Production of Documents in Lieu of Deposition. Kauai Seascape Nursery, Inc. (Ferry, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan Re: Notice of Production of Documents in Lieu of Deposition. Kauai Restoration (Ferry, John)
January 7, 2021 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Frank Rowan, Karina Rowan Re: Notice of Production of Documents in Lieu of Deposition. B&G Pacific, Inc. (Ferry, John)
January 4, 2021 Filing 8 Plaintiffs Karina Rowan and Frank Rowan's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ferry, John) Modified on 1/6/2021 (jo)
January 4, 2021 Filing 7 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 1/11/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 4, 2021 Filing 6 Defendants Kevin Ditamore and Ayumi Ditamore's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Schmitt, Randall) Modified on 1/7/2021 (jo)
December 16, 2020 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii, 5CCV-20-0000095 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Pleadings Part 1, #3 Pleadings Part 2, #4 Pleadings Part 3, #5 Pleadings Part 4, #6 Mailing Envelope) (jni)
December 15, 2020 Filing 4 Defendants Kevin Ditamore and Ayumi Ditamore's ANSWER to Complaint filed on 09/17/2020 by Ayumi Ditamore, Kevin Ditamore.(Schmitt, Randall)
December 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/11/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/10/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00543 JMS-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 10, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kevin Ditamore, Ayumi Ditamore from In the Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, case number 5CCV-20-0000095. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2459432), filed by Kevin Ditamore, Ayumi Ditamore. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Randall K. Schmitt, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Schmitt, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rowan et al v. Ditamore et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin Ditamore
Represented By: Randall K. Schmitt
Represented By: Nicholas Koichi Nihei Kido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ayumi Ditamore
Represented By: Randall K. Schmitt
Represented By: Nicholas Koichi Nihei Kido
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Rowan
Represented By: John Dickinson Ferry, III
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Represented By: Mark R. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karina Rowan
Represented By: John Dickinson Ferry, III
Represented By: Bruce D. Voss
Represented By: Mark R. Zenger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?