Kozuck v. Hilton Management LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Dorie Kozuck
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., Roe Governmental Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Dolphin Quest, Inc., Roe Non-Profit Corporations 1-10, Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc., Doe Partnerships 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10 and Hilton Management LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv00571
Filed: December 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Management LLC Re: Defendant Hilton Management LLCs First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Dorie Kozuck (Hughes, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Management LLC Re: Defendant Hilton Management LLCs First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Dorie Kozuck (Hughes, Thomas)
February 18, 2021 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting JOINT RULE 26(F) REPORT OF THE PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Hughes, Thomas)
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Hilton Management LLC.(Hughes, Thomas)
February 10, 2021 Filing 10 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Summons Returned Executed Re: Dolphin Quest, INC. Acknowledgement served on 1/21/2021 - filed by Dorie Kozuck. (Remillard, Laurent) Modified on 2/10/2021 (jo)
January 21, 2021 Filing 9 STIPULATION AND AGREEMENT Of Parties To Dismiss Without Prejudice Certain Defendants and Substitute In Defendant Hilton Management LLC. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY. (cib) Modified to remove signature date from docket text on 1/21/2021 (cib).
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to Dolphin Quest, Inc. (jo)
January 8, 2021 Filing 7 Summons (Proposed) (Remillard, Laurent)
January 6, 2021 Filing 6 EO: At the #5 parties' request and for good cause shown, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 01/25/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 03/29/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Scheduling conference statements are due by 03/22/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 6, 2021 Filing 5 Letter from Stacy Y. Ma dated January 5, 2021 requesting a 60 day continuance of the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference that is currently scheduled for January 25, 2021. (bbb)
December 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 1/25/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
December 24, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00571 SOM-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
December 24, 2020 Filing 2 First Corporate Disclosure Statement by HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC. for HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC., Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Thomas)
December 24, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC. from Third Circuit Court, State of Hawaii, case number 3CCV-20-0000457. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2464676), filed by Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc., HILTON WORLDWIDE HOLDINGS, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate of Service)(Hughes, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kozuck v. Hilton Management LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Park Hotels & Resorts, Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dolphin Quest, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Non-Profit Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Worldwide Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorie Kozuck
Represented By: Don V. Huynh
Represented By: Rechelle A.M. Barbour
Represented By: Laurent J. Remillard, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?