Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc., Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Amtrust North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv00576
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER DIRECTING SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEFING re #8 Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/25/2021. (emt, )
February 18, 2021 Filing 19 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand filed by Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Compliance, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew) Modified on 2/18/2021 (emt, ).
February 12, 2021 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits A-D; Certificate of Service [DEFENDANTS ASSOCIATED INDUSTRIES INSURANCE COMPANY, INC. AND AMTRUST NORTH AMERICA, INC.S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND FILED JANUARY 12, 2021; DECLARATION OF COUNSEL; EXHIBITS 1-9; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] filed by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas P. Ching , #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Exhibit 8, #10 Exhibit 9, #11 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold) Modified on 2/18/2021 (emt, ).
January 28, 2021 Filing 17 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 09:00AM is CONTINUED to 4/6/2021 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 25, 2021 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendants Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. and AmTrust North America, Inc.. (Matayoshi, Jerold)
January 25, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew) Modified on 1/29/2021 (emt, ).
January 25, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew)
January 22, 2021 Filing 13 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 2/1/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand set for 3/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Briefing shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. (tyk)
January 13, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 20-00576 DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
January 12, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff's Motion to Remand; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Counsel; Exhibits A-D; Certificate of Service Andrew James Lautenbach appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Andrew J. Lautenbach, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. re #3 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #1 Notice of Removal,, (Matayoshi, Jerold) Modified on 12/30/2020 (jo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jo)
December 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 2/1/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/28/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00576 RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Wesco Insurance Company for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.; Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services, Inc. for Amtrust North America, Inc... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Matayoshi, Jerold)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. from Fifth Circuit Court, case number 5CCV-20-0000043. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2465202), filed by Amtrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Part 1 of 4), #2 Exhibit A (Part 2 of 4), #3 Exhibit A (Part 3 of 4), #4 Exhibit A (Part 4 of 4), #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amtrust North America, Inc.
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Goldberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?