Fukushima v. State of Hawaii Board of Education, et al.
Plaintiff: Jonelle M Fukushima
Defendant: Does 1-10, State of Hawaii Board of Education and State of Hawaii Department of Education
Case Number: 1:2020cv00582
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Education
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1343
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 DEFENDANTS STATE OF HAWAII BOARD OF EDUCATION AND STATE OF HAWAII DEPARTMENT OF EDUCATIONS ANSWER TO COMPLAINT FILED ON DECEMBER 30, 2020; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE ANSWER to #1 Complaint by State of Hawaii Board of Education, State of Hawaii Department of Education. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Richardson, Kevin)
February 9, 2021 Filing 10 EO: At plaintiff's request, to allow more time to serve the defendant, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 03/01/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 04/08/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 04/01/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
January 28, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonelle M Fukushima. State of Hawaii Board of Education served on 1/25/2021. (Hsieh, Peter)
January 7, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonelle M Fukushima. State of Hawaii Department of Education served on 1/6/2021. (Hsieh, Peter)
January 7, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jonelle M Fukushima. State of Hawaii Board of Education served on 1/5/2021. (Hsieh, Peter)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to All Defendants (jo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:30 AM on 3/1/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 12/30/2020. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 20-00582 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (jo)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Jonelle M Fukushima. (Hsieh, Peter)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT , Demand for Jury Trial, Summons against Hawaii State Board of Education, Hawaii State Department of Education ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2466432.), filed by Jonelle M Fukushima.(Hsieh, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fukushima v. State of Hawaii Board of Education, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii Board of Education
Represented By: Kevin M. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii Department of Education
Represented By: Kevin M. Richardson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonelle M Fukushima
Represented By: Peter C. Hsieh
Represented By: Michael Jay Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?