Shin v. Hawaii Medical Service Association
Plaintiff: Grace Park, Yun Hee Shin, Sook Ja Park, Soon Y. Park, Jae Sook Kim and Kyong Chong
Defendant: Jane Does 1-99, John Does 1-99, Doe Entities 1-20, Doe Governmental Units 1-20 and Hawaii Medical Service Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00039
Filed: January 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER; EXHIBIT "A" - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/9/2021. (emt, )
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Kyong Chong, Jae Sook Kim, Grace Park, Sook Ja Park, Soon Y. Park, Yun Hee Shin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Bonner, Addison)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hawaii Medical Service Association Certificate of Service [Re: Defendant Hawaii Medical Service Association's Initial Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FRCP Rule 26] (Meyer, John-Anderson)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Trevor N. Tamashiro on behalf of Kyong Chong, Jae Sook Kim, Grace Park, Sook Ja Park, Soon Y. Park, Yun Hee Shin on behalf of Kyong Chong, Jae Sook Kim, Grace Park, Sook Ja Park, Soon Y. Park, Yun Hee Shin. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Tamashiro, Trevor)
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/22/2021. (emt, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/22/2021. (emt, )
February 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/22/2021. (emt, )
February 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCETelephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference held. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to beissued. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 09:00 AM on 5/9/2022 in Aha Nonoi before JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 3/29/2022 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 7 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 5/20/2021 at 10:00 AM in Video Conference Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 1/28/2022 at 10:00 AM in Chambers of Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/8/2021. Discovery due by 3/11/2022. (ATT / 9:00 a.m. - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Bonner, Addison) Modified on 2/18/2021 (emt, ).
February 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendant Hawaii Medical Service Association's Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
February 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 REPORT of Planning Meeting ; Certificate of Service. (Bonner, Addison)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV200001660 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (jni)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Reassignment: Please reflect new Civil case number CV 21-00039 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
February 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Consent Election Form
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Consent Election Form
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by Hawaii Medical Service Association.(Meyer, John-Anderson)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. (Attachments: #1 Election Form: Consent to Jurisdiction by United States Magistrate Judge) YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. While the decision to consent or not to consent to the exercise of jurisdiction by the magistrate judge is entirely voluntarily, the duty to respond to this notice is mandatory. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and filing it with the court no later than twenty-one (21) daysafter entry of appearance. In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 2/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/20/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00039 WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hawaii Medical Service Association. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Meyer, John-Anderson)
January 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hawaii Medical Service Association Defendant Hawaii Medical Service Association's Notice of Removal; Declaration of John-Anderson Meyer; Exhibits "A"-"B"; Certificate of Service from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-20-0001660. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2474071), filed by Hawaii Medical Service Association. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John-Anderson Meyer, #2 Exhibit "A" - Complaint, #3 Exhibit "B" - Acceptance of Service, #4 Certificate of Service, #5 Civil Cover Sheet)(Meyer, John-Anderson)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shin v. Hawaii Medical Service Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grace Park
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yun Hee Shin
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sook Ja Park
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soon Y. Park
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jae Sook Kim
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyong Chong
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Trevor N. Tamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii Medical Service Association
Represented By: Dianne W. Brookins
Represented By: John-Anderson L. Meyer
Represented By: Jenny Nakamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?