O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC v. LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC
Plaintiff: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Defendant: LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00060
Filed: January 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2021 Filing 8 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/22/2021 is CONTINUED to 5/10/2021 at 9:15 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 18, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #7 Consent Election Form, was filed incorrectly in this case. As this case is already assigned to a district judge, the filing party is referred to form HID 85 "Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge", available on the court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov. Once ALL parties have signed, the COMPLETED form should be submitted by email to the district judge. (emt, )
February 12, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Election Form
January 27, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Alston, Paul)
January 25, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC. (jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
January 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 3/22/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
January 25, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00060 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings.(jni)
January 22, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief and Damages against LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2475846.), filed by O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Demand for Jury Trial, #2 (Proposed) Summons, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Alston, Paul) Modified on 1/25/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC v. LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: O'Reilly Auto Enterprises, LLC
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Claire Wong Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIPT East Kaahumanu Avenue, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?