Bassarath v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Plaintiff: Kayann Bassarath
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., Doe Corporations 1-10 and Doe Partnerships 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00070
Filed: February 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 19, 2021 Filing 14 Return of Service on Subpoena Kaiser Permanente was served on 03/03/2021 (Lezy, Normand)
March 19, 2021 Filing 13 Return of Service on Subpoena Emergency Medical Services was served on 03/02/2021 (Lezy, Normand)
March 17, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (First Request for Answers to Interrogatories and First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff) (Benton, Shawn)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 3/8/2021. (emt, )
March 8, 2021 Filing 10 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Mr. Alejandro reports Plaintiff still treating. Parties do not anticipate discovery issues and are amenable to early settlement discussions following required discovery. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 7/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326. Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 6/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 5/3/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 2/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference Statements due 2/8/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 7/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 1/12/2022. Discovery due by 4/15/2022. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:15 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
March 8, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Incorrect Attorney Filer - Please be advised that Document #9 Scheduling Conference Statement filed by Kayann Bassarath, was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit corrected filings. (emt, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 9 Plaintiff Kayann Bassarath's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Honda, Glenn) Modified on 3/8/2021 Document electronically signed by George C. Alejandro(emt, ).
March 1, 2021 Filing 8 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 3/8/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
March 1, 2021 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement by Walmart Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
March 1, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Wal-Mart Stores, Inc. (Notice of Depositions Upon Written Interrogatories) (Benton, Shawn)
February 8, 2021 Filing 4 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV210000014. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate, #2 Case Detail Docket List) (emt, )
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 3/8/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/4/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
February 4, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00070 JAO-RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
February 4, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Walmart Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-21-0000014. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2481232), filed by Walmart Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Complaint; Summons) , #2 Exhibit B (Defendant Walmart Inc.'s Answer to Complaint; Demand for Jury Trial; Certificate of Service) , #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 2/4/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bassarath v. Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores, Inc.
Represented By: Shawn L.M. Benton
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayann Bassarath
Represented By: Glenn Tadaomi Honda, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?