Devine v. OpalHaus Trading Incorporated
Plaintiff: XueMei Devine doing business as Anela's Jewelry, Charles Devine doing business as Anela's Jade, XueMei Devine and Charles Devine
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10, OpalHaus Trading Incorporated doing business as OpalHaus, Seaside doing business as SeasideAve8, Wendy Lo, Maytas Monsereenusorn and Hokulea Jewelry doing business as HawaiiHokuleaJewelry
Case Number: 1:2021cv00114
Filed: February 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
2 Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 15, 2021 Filing 32 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Charles Devine, XueMei Devine identifying Other Affiliate Anela's Jewelry for XueMei Devine; Other Affiliate Anela's Jade for Charles Devine.. (Li, Phillip) Modified on 4/20/2021 (emt, ).
April 2, 2021 Filing 31 EO: Based on Plaintiffs' request, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 4/26/2021 to 5/25/2021 at 9:45 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T conference 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
March 26, 2021 Filing 30 NOTICE by Charles Devine, XueMei Devine REPORT ON THE FILING OR DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION OR APPEAL REGARDING A COPYRIGHT Charles Devine, XueMei Devine. (Li, Phillip)
March 18, 2021 Filing 29 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XueMei Devine, Charles Devine. Maytas Monsereenusorn served on 3/9/2021. (Li, Phillip)
March 18, 2021 Filing 28 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XueMei Devine, Charles Devine. Seaside served on 3/9/2021. (Li, Phillip)
March 18, 2021 Filing 27 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XueMei Devine, Charles Devine. Wendy Lo served on 3/10/2021. (Li, Phillip)
March 18, 2021 Filing 26 SUMMONS Returned Executed by XueMei Devine, Charles Devine. OpalHaus Trading Incorporated served on 3/10/2021. (Li, Phillip)
March 8, 2021 Filing 25 Summons Issued as to OpalHaus Trading Incorporated. (emt, )
March 4, 2021 Filing 24 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
March 4, 2021 Filing 23 Summons Issued as to Wendy Lo. (emt, )
March 3, 2021 Filing 22 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR EX PARTE TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND SEIZURE ORDER re #7 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 2/26/2021. (emt, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to Maytas Monsereenusorn. (emt, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Wendy Lo. (emt, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 18 Summons Issued as to Seaside. (emt, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 17 Summons Issued as to Hokulea Jewelry. (emt, )
February 26, 2021 Filing 16 Summons Issued as to OpalHaus Trading Incorporated. (emt, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 15 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Filing 14 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Filing 13 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Li, Phillip)
February 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/25/2021. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 21-00114 DKW -WRP on all further pleadings . (emt, )
February 25, 2021 Filing 9 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 AMENDED NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Charles Devine, XueMei Devine . (Li, Phillip) Modified on 2/25/2021 (emt, ).
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 EX PARTE Application FOR (1) TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND (2) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND FOR EXPEDITED DISCOVERY AGAINST DEFENDANTS Phillip A. Li appearing for Plaintiffs Charles Devine, XueMei Devine (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Application, #2 Declaration XueMei Devine, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Exhibit J, #13 Exhibit K, #14 Exhibit L, #15 Exhibit M, #16 Exhibit N, #17 Exhibit O, #18 Exhibit P, #19 Exhibit Q, #20 Exhibit R, #21 Exhibit S, #22 Exhibit T, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y(1)(1 of 3), #28 Exhibit Y(1)(2 of 3), #29 Exhibit Y(1)(3 of 3), #30 Exhibit Y(2), #31 Exhibit Y(3)(1 of 3), #32 Exhibit Y(3)(2 of 3), #33 Exhibit Y(3)(3 of 3), #34 Declaration Charles Devine, #35 Declaration Hector J. Cabrejos, #36 Exhibit 1, #37 Exhibit 2, #38 Exhibit 3, #39 Exhibit 4, #40 Declaration Mariela Fernandez, #41 Exhibit 1, #42 Exhibit 2, #43 Exhibit 3, #44 Declaration Counsel, #45 Certificate of Compliance)(Li, Phillip)
February 24, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by Charles Devine, XueMei Devine . (Li, Phillip) Modified on 2/25/2021 (emt, ).
February 24, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS: Plaintiff's Counsel, please complete the attached AO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright. Please submit to the Clerk's Office, District of Hawaii using the filing event "Notice (Other)". The Clerk's Office will transmit the AO 121 Report to the Register of Copyrights. (jo)
February 24, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 4/26/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 2/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
February 24, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 21-00114 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
February 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR COPYRIGHT INFRINGEMENT; Demand For Jury Trial against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2489609.), filed by XueMei Devine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H1 (1 of 3), #9 Exhibit H1 (2 of 3), #10 Exhibit H1 (3 of 3), #11 Exhibit H2, #12 Exhibit H3 (1 of 3), #13 Exhibit H3 (2 of 3), #14 Exhibit H3 (3 of 3), #15 Civil Cover Sheet)(Li, Phillip) Modified on 2/24/2021 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Devine v. OpalHaus Trading Incorporated
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OpalHaus Trading Incorporated doing business as OpalHaus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Seaside doing business as SeasideAve8
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wendy Lo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Maytas Monsereenusorn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hokulea Jewelry doing business as HawaiiHokuleaJewelry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XueMei Devine doing business as Anela's Jewelry
Represented By: Phillip A. Li
Represented By: Tyler A. Tsukazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Devine doing business as Anela's Jade
Represented By: Phillip A. Li
Represented By: Tyler A. Tsukazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: XueMei Devine
Represented By: Phillip A. Li
Represented By: Tyler A. Tsukazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Devine
Represented By: Phillip A. Li
Represented By: Tyler A. Tsukazaki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?