Alexander & Baldwin, LLC v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Plaintiff: Alexander & Baldwin, LLC
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00129
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF ALL CLAIMS AND PARTIES; ORDER by Alexander & Baldwin, LLC - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/5/2021. (emt, )
April 29, 2021 Filing 24 EO: On April 29, 2021, the Court received a stipulation from the parties to continue the May 14, 2021 hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand, pending settlement discussions in a related State proceeding. Dkt. No. 23. In light of the parties' stipulation, the Court VACATES the May 14, 2021 hearing and holds in abeyance the motion to remand, pending completion of settlement discussions in the State proceeding. Within ninety (90) days of entry of this Order, the parties shall update the Court on the status of events concerning this case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 FIRST STIPULATION TO CONTINUE HEARING ON ALEXANDER & BALDWIN, LLC'S MOTION FOR ORDER OF REMAND; ORDER #15 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/29/2021. The hearing presently set for May 14, 2021 at 9:30 am on A&B's Motion for Remand is hereby continued. The parties shall, if appropriate, request a new hearing date for the Motion for Remand after resolution of the Underlying Litigation. (emt, )
April 23, 2021 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC's Motion for Order of Remand; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Kelly G. LaPorte; Exhibits A-B; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Amy Collins Cassidy, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Declaration of Alida Pecanin, #6 Exhibit 3, #7 Declaration of Leticia Diaz, #8 Certificate of Word Count, #9 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
April 9, 2021 Filing 21 EO: In light of the #15 Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC's Motion for Order of Remand, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 04/12/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 06/09/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD by telephone. Scheduling conference statements due by 06/02/2021.Until further notice, for all hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
April 9, 2021 Filing 20 Plaintiff/Counterclaim-Defendant Alexander & Baldwin, LLC's ANSWER to #6 Defendant/Counterclaim-Plaintiff National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, P.A.'s Counterclaim, filed 3/22/21 (Dkt. 6); Certificate of Service by Alexander & Baldwin, LLC.(LaPorte, Kelly) Modified on 4/13/2021 (emt, ).
April 5, 2021 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT Joint Report of AB and National Union Pursuant to FRCP 26(f) by Alexander & Baldwin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
April 5, 2021 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement of Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Swartzfager, Lisa)
April 5, 2021 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
April 1, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing on #15 Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC's Motion for Order of Remand is set for 5/14/2021 at 9:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Briefing shall be due in accordance with Local Rule 7.2.(tyk)
March 29, 2021 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC's Motion for Order of Remand; Memorandum in Support of Motion; Declaration of Kelly G. LaPorte; Exhibits A-B; Certificate of Compliance; Certificate of Service Kelly G. LaPorte appearing for Plaintiff Alexander & Baldwin, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kelly G. LaPorte, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Compliance, #6 Certificate of Service)(LaPorte, Kelly)
March 29, 2021 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Alexander & Baldwin, LLC. (LaPorte, Kelly)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO RICHARD H. NICOLAIDES, JR. re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/24/2021. (emt, )
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO AMY COLLINS CASSIDY re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/24/2021. (emt, )
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ALIDA PECANIN re #7 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 3/24/2021. (emt, )
March 23, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - If the filing party has not already done so, please email the proposed orders associated with the following docket entries: #7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Alida Pecanin], #8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Amy Collins Cassidy] and #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Richard H. Nicolaides, Jr.] to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, )
March 22, 2021 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV200001689. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS) , #2 Case Detail Docket List) (emt, ) Modified on 3/23/2021 (emt, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Richard H. Nicolaides, Jr.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2501201.J. Patrick Gallagher appearing for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Amy Collins Cassidy] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2501193.J. Patrick Gallagher appearing for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Alida Pecanin] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2501188.J. Patrick Gallagher appearing for Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Counsel, #2 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.,'s COUNTERCLAIM against Alexander & Baldwin, LLC, COUNTERCLAIM against Alexander & Baldwin, LLC, filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.) Modified on 3/23/2021 to remove duplicate parties (emt, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 4/12/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00129 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. identifying Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty Inc., Corporate Parent AIG Property Casualty U.S., Inc., Corporate Parent American International Group, Inc. for National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA... (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Gallagher, J.)
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA. from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-20-0001689. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2496683), filed by National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of J. Patrick Gallagher, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Gallagher, J.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Alexander & Baldwin, LLC v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alexander & Baldwin, LLC
Represented By: Kelly G. LaPorte
Represented By: Lisa Katherine Swartzfager
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA.
Represented By: J. Patrick Gallagher
Represented By: Amy Collins Cassidy
Represented By: Richard H. Nicolaides, Jr.
Represented By: Alida Pecanin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?