Acadian Steel, Inc. v. American Contractors Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Acadian Steel, Inc.
3Rd Party Plaintiff: American Contractors Indemnity Company
3Rd Party Defendant: Colette Piper, Acadian Steel Erectors, Inc. and Jarvan L. Piper
Case Number: 1:2021cv00131
Filed: March 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 6, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance by Kurt K. Leong on behalf of American Contractors Indemnity Company on behalf of American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Leong, Kurt)
May 4, 2021 Filing 17 EO: By joint agreement of the parties, to allow sufficient time for parties to properly meet and confer, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 05/10/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 06/09/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 06/02/2021. Plaintiff's counsel to notify the parties.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 16 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TIME IS ADVANCED to 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 05/10/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements were due on 05/03/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 4, 2021 Filing 15 Summons Issued on a Third-Party Complaint as to Acadian Steel Erectors, Inc. (emt, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 14 Summons Issued on a Third-Party Complaint as to Colette Piper. (emt, )
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 Summons Issued on a Third-Party Complaint as to Jarvan L. Piper. (emt, )
May 3, 2021 Filing 12 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; Exhibits "A-B"; Summons)(Ogawa, Roy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 11 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; Exhibits "A-B"; Summons)(Ogawa, Roy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 10 Summons (Proposed) (Attachments: #1 Complaint for Declaratory Judgment; Exhibits "A-B"; Summons)(Ogawa, Roy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by American Contractors Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent HCC Insurance Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings, Inc., Corporate Parent Surety Associates Holding Co., Inc., Corporate Parent Tokio Marine & Nichido Fire Insurance Co., Ltd. for American Contractors Indemnity Company.. (Ogawa, Roy)
May 3, 2021 Filing 8 Defendant American Contractors Indemnity Company's THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Jarvan L. Piper, Colette Piper, Acadian Steel Erectors, Inc. , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT Defendant American Contractors Indemnity Company's Third Party Complaint against Jarvan L. Piper, Colette Piper, Acadian Steel Erectors, Inc., filed by American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "1", #2 Exhibit "2", #3 Exhibit "3", #4 Exhibit "4", #5 Exhibit "5", #6 Exhibit "6", #7 Exhibit "7", #8 Exhibit "8", #9 Exhibit "9", #10 Exhibit "10", #11 Exhibit "11", #12 Exhibit "12", #13 Certificate of Service)(Ogawa, Roy) Modified on 5/4/2021 to remove duplicate parties (emt, ).
May 3, 2021 Filing 7 Defendant American Contractors Indemnity Company's ANSWER to Complaint for Declaratory Judgment, Filed March 12, 2021, COUNTERCLAIM against Acadian Steel, Inc. by American Contractors Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Defendant American Contractors Indemnity Company's Counterclaim Against Plaintiff Acadian Steel Inc., #2 Exhibit "1", #3 Exhibit "2", #4 Exhibit "3", #5 Exhibit "4", #6 Exhibit "5", #7 Exhibit "6", #8 Exhibit "7", #9 Exhibit "8", #10 Exhibit "9", #11 Exhibit "10", #12 Exhibit "11", #13 Certificate of Service)(Ogawa, Roy) Modified on 5/4/2021 (emt, ).
April 15, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Acadian Steel, Inc.. American Contractors Indemnity Company served on 4/12/2021. (Oshiro, Anna)
March 12, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
March 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/10/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/12/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Contractors Indemnity Company. (emt, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00131 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against American Contractors Indemnity Company ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2496939.), filed by Acadian Steel, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Main Document Summons)(Zeigler, Joanna)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Acadian Steel, Inc. v. American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Acadian Steel, Inc.
Represented By: Na Lan
Represented By: Joanna C. Zeigler
Represented By: Anna H. Oshiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party plaintiff: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Represented By: Roy T. Ogawa
Represented By: Kurt K. Leong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Colette Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Acadian Steel Erectors, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
3rd party defendant: Jarvan L. Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?