Handa v. Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Plaintiff: Teijiro Handa
Defendant: Douglas Brennan, MAS One USA LLC, Honda Aircraft Company, LLC, Eugene O'Reilly, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Matterhorn Aviation Limited, Doe Governmental Entities 1-10, Simon Roads, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Doe Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00141
Filed: March 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 29, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 29, 2021 Filing 15 Plaintiff/Counterclaim Defendant Teijiro Handa's ANSWER to #10 Defendant/Counterclaimant Honda Aircraft Company LLC's Counterclaim filed April 8, 2021 by Teijiro Handa. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hosoda, Lyle) Modified on 4/30/2021 (emt, ).
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO WILLIAM J. KATT re #12 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/21/2021. (emt, )
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARK G. LEDWIN re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/21/2021. (emt, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 12 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [WILLIAM J. KATT] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2513275.Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant Honda Aircraft Company, LLC, Counter Claimant Honda Aircraft Company, LLC (Fukunaga, Kenneth)
April 20, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice MARK G. LEDWIN Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2513271.Kenneth K. Fukunaga appearing for Defendant Honda Aircraft Company, LLC, Counter Claimant Honda Aircraft Company, LLC (Fukunaga, Kenneth)
April 9, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Exhibits Not Attached as Separate PDFS - Please be advised that exhibits included in Document #10 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim, filed by Honda Aircraft Company LLC were not submitted as separate pdf attachments. Please refer to Section 5.0 Exhibits, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, for additional instructions on how to file exhibits as separate attachments to the main document (each exhibit should be attached as separate attachments to the main document and labeled). No further action is necessary as to this entry. (emt, )
April 8, 2021 Filing 10 DEFENDANT HONDA AIRCRAFT COMPANY, LLC'S ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand , COUNTERCLAIM against Teijiro Handa by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Counterclaim, #2 Exhibit Exhibits A-H, #3 Demand for Jury Trial, #4 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth) Modified on 4/9/2021 (emt, ).
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 EO: Based on the parties' request and agreement, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 4/19/2021 to 6/7/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T conference 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiff shall notify Defendants. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 RETURN AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed. Honda Aircraft Company, LLC served on March 18, 2021 . filed by Teijiro Handa. (Bonner, Addison) Modified on 3/23/2021 (emt, ).
March 23, 2021 Filing 7 RETURN AND ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF SERVICE Executed . MAS One USA LLC served on March 10, 2021. filed by Teijiro Handa. (Bonner, Addison) Modified on 3/23/2021 (emt, ).
March 22, 2021 Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV210000240. (Attachments: #1 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS), #2 Case Detail Docket List) (emt, )
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/19/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00141 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Honda Aircraft Company, LLC for Honda Aircraft Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)
March 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Fukunaga, Kenneth)
March 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC [NOTICE OF REMOVAL; EXHIBITS "A" AND "B"; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE] from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-21-0000240. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2498300), filed by Honda Aircraft Company, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service)(Fukunaga, Kenneth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Handa v. Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Douglas Brennan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MAS One USA LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Honda Aircraft Company, LLC
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Represented By: Kenneth K. Fukunaga
Represented By: William J. Katt
Represented By: Mark G. Ledwin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eugene O'Reilly
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matterhorn Aviation Limited
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Simon Roads
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teijiro Handa
Represented By: Addison D Bonner
Represented By: Megan Ashley Coburn
Represented By: Lyle S. Hosoda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?