Allen et al v. Allstate Corporation, The
Plaintiff: Greg Allen and Joanne Allen
Defendant: The Allstate Corporation doing business as Allstate Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00150
Filed: March 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 4001
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2021 Filing 9 EO: Finding good cause in support thereof, the Court GRANTS Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Continue Scheduling Conference and Extend Time for Service of Process. The time to serve the Complaint is continued up to and including 7/17/2021. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 5/17/2021 to 7/27/2021 at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. Plaintiffs shall notify Defendant. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
April 12, 2021 Filing 8 EX PARTE Application Matthew Dennis Mannisto appearing for Plaintiffs Greg Allen, Joanne Allen (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration, #3 Certificate of Service)(Mannisto, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Greg Allen, Joanne Allen re #4 Civil Waiver of Service Packet, (Mannisto, Matthew)
March 24, 2021 Filing 6 Consent Election Form
March 19, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
March 19, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 9:00AM on 5/17/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
March 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00150 WRP on all further pleadings.(jni)
March 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against The Allstate Corporation All Plaintiffs (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2500256.), filed by Greg Allen, Jr, Joanne Allen. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4)(Mannisto, Matthew) Docket Text Modified on 3/19/2021. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allen et al v. Allstate Corporation, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Greg Allen
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Mannisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joanne Allen
Represented By: Matthew Dennis Mannisto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Allstate Corporation doing business as Allstate Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?