Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Plaintiff: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc., Doe Entities 1-10, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and AmTrust North America, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00161
Filed: March 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2021 Filing 15 EO: Pursuant to Local Rule 7.1(c),the Court will decide #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand without a hearing. The hearing on the motion, set for 5/28/2021 before Judge Derrick K. Watson, is VACATED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
May 12, 2021 Filing 14 REPLY in Support of #8 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. LAUTENBACH; EXHIBITS A-I; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Andrew J. Lautenbach, #2 Exhibit J, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew) Modified on 5/13/2021 (emt, ).
May 11, 2021 Filing 13 Errata to #12 Memorandum in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand Filed April 5, 2021, Filed May 7, 2021 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Nicholas) Modified on 5/12/2021 (emt, ).
May 7, 2021 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #8 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. LAUTENBACH; EXHIBITS A-I; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by AmTrust North America, Inc., Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Nicholas P. Ching, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Nicholas)
April 9, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing on #8 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand is set for 5/28/2021 at 09:30 AM in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Briefing shall be due pursuant to Local Rule 7.2. (tyk)
April 9, 2021 Filing 10 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 4/26/2021 is CONTINUED to 6/21/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
April 8, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Planning Meeting [REPORT OF THE MEETING OF THE PARTIES; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE]. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Ching, Nicholas)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to Remand PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF ANDREW J. LAUTENBACH; EXHIBITS A-I; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Andrew James Lautenbach appearing for Plaintiff Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Andrew J. Lautenbach, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Exhibit E, #8 Exhibit F, #9 Exhibit G, #10 Exhibit H, #11 Exhibit I, #12 Certificate of Service)(Lautenbach, Andrew)
March 30, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket number #7 Consent Election Form, was filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that this case is already assigned to a district judge. The parties shall disregard the entry. (emt, )
March 29, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Election Form Modified on 3/30/2021 refer to Advisory Entry issued on March 30, 2021 (emt, ).
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/24/2021. Case reassigned to JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT no longer assigned to case. Please reflect new case number CV 21-00161 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 4/26/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
March 24, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00161 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
March 23, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Matayoshi, Jerold)
March 23, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent AmTrust Financial Services Inc. for Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc... (Matayoshi, Jerold)
March 23, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc. from Fifth Circuit, case number 5CCV-20-0000043. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2501844), filed by Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 1 of 10], #2 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 2 of 10], #3 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 3 of 10], #4 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 4 of 10], #5 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 5 of 10], #6 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 6 of 10], #7 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 7 of 10], #8 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 8 of 10], #9 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 9 of 10], #10 Exhibit Exhibit A [Part 10 of 10], #11 Exhibit Exhibits B-G, #12 Certificate of Service)(Matayoshi, Jerold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC v. Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hawaii Life Real Estate Services, LLC
Represented By: Robert M. Goldberg
Represented By: Andrew James Lautenbach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Associated Industries Insurance Company, Inc.
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AmTrust North America, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Petersen Ching
Represented By: Jerold T. Matayoshi
Represented By: Sheree A. Kon-Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?