Knight v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Gene Knight and Christy Knight
Defendant: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00182
Filed: April 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1346
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 1, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Filing 10 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 6/14/2021 is CONTINUED to 8/2/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via AT&T Connect Audio Conference at 1-888-278-0296 / Access Code: 8224751. The parties shall file Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statements no later than 7/26/2021. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
April 22, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gene Knight, Christy Knight. United States of America served on 4/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proof of Service)(Miyashita, Robert)
April 15, 2021 Filing 8 Consent Election Form
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to United States of America. (jni)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/14/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/14/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 14, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00182 WRP on all further pleadings.(jni)
April 13, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Miyashita, Robert)
April 13, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial against All Plaintiffs ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2510354.), filed by Gene Knight. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miyashita, Robert) Modified on 4/15/2021 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Knight v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gene Knight
Represented By: Robert Saburo Miyashita
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christy Knight
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Represented By: Robert Saburo Miyashita
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?