Law Offices of Richard E. Wilson, LLC v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Richard E. Wilson, LLC
Defendant: Laurence H. Smith, Mitchell T. Heller, Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC, Doe Partnerships 1-20, Doe Entities 1-20, John Does 1-20, Jane Does 1-20 and Doe Corporations 1-20
Case Number: 1:2021cv00184
Filed: April 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion - #13 MOTION to Remand is set for 07/26/2021 at 10:00 AM before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Given the current public health crisis, the court will notify the parties in due course whether the hearing will be held in court, by video conference, by telephone conference, or whether the matter will be submitted without a hearing under Local Rule 7.1(c).(CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh) Modified on 5/28/2021 (rlfh)
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION to Remand Richard E. Wilson appearing for Plaintiff Law Offices of Richard E. Wilson, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION, #2 Declaration DECLARATION OF RICHARD E. WILSON and EXHIBITS 1-30, #3 Exhibit EXHIBIT 1, #4 Exhibit EXHIBIT 2, #5 Exhibit EXHIBIT 3, #6 Exhibit EXHIBIT 4, #7 Exhibit EXHIBIT 5, #8 Exhibit EXHIBIT 6, #9 Exhibit EXHIBIT 7, #10 Exhibit EXHIBIT 8, #11 Exhibit EXHIBIT 9, #12 Exhibit EXHIBIT 10, #13 Exhibit EXHIBIT 11, #14 Exhibit EXHIBIT 12, #15 Exhibit EXHIBIT 13, #16 Exhibit EXHIBIT 14, #17 Exhibit EXHIBIT 15, #18 Exhibit EXHIBIT 16, #19 Exhibit EXHIBIT 17, #20 Exhibit EXHIBIT 18, #21 Exhibit EXHIBIT 19, #22 Exhibit EXHIBIT 20, #23 Exhibit EXHIBIT 21, #24 Exhibit EXHIBIT 22, #25 Exhibit EXHIBIT 23, #26 Exhibit EXHIBIT 24, #27 Exhibit EXHIBIT 25, #28 Exhibit EXHIBIT 26, #29 Exhibit EXHIBIT 27, #30 Exhibit EXHIBIT 28, #31 Exhibit EXHIBIT 29, #32 Exhibit EXHIBIT 30, #33 Exhibit CERTIFICATION OF WORD COUNT, #34 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Wilson, Richard)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on May 17, 2021. (bbb)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 05/17/2022 at 8:30 a.m. in Aha Kaulike before CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 04/05/2022 at 9:45 a.m. via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference is set for 02/11/2022 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 12/15/2021. Discovery due by 03/18/2022.If the parties so wish to hold an Early Settlement Conference with the Court, they may do so by contacting Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield's Courtroom Manager, Bernie Aurio at (808) 541-1298 or via email at bbb@hid.uscourts.gov at anytime. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:03 - 9:08) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference TIME IS ADVANCED TO 9:00 a.m. on the same date of 05/17/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD via telephone. Scheduling conference statements are due by 05/10/2021.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Wilson, Richard)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement for Defendants Laurence H. Smith, Mitchell T. Heller, and Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC. (Shimodoi, Nathan)
May 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report of Planning Meeting. (Shimodoi, Nathan)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ANSWER to Complaint by Mitchell T. Heller, Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC, Laurence H. Smith.(Shimodoi, Nathan)
April 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC for Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shimodoi, Nathan)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the First Circuit Court, State of Hawaii; 1CCV-21-0000331 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Circuit Court Clerk's Certificate Regarding Judiciary Information Management System (JIMS)) (jo)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 5/17/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00184 JMS-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC, Mitchell T. Heller, Laurence H. Smith from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-21-0000331. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2511708), filed by Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC, Mitchell T. Heller, Laurence H. Smith. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Alston, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Certificate of Service)(Alston, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Law Offices of Richard E. Wilson, LLC v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laurence H. Smith
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nathan P Shimodoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell T. Heller
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nathan P Shimodoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Makaiwa Resort Company, LLC
Represented By: Paul Alston
Represented By: Nathan P Shimodoi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Law Offices of Richard E. Wilson, LLC
Represented By: Richard E. Wilson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?