Javier v. Saul
Plaintiff: Val Javier
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 1:2021cv00191
Filed: April 20, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 9, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel S. Moriyama on behalf of Andrew M. Saul on behalf of Andrew M. Saul. (Moriyama, Rachel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO DAVID B. GOETZ re: #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 5/14/2021. DAVID B. GOETZ, ESQ. (Firm: Gonzalez & Goetz, LLC) added as attorney Pro Hac Vice as to Plaintiff (jo)
May 13, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2524917.Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff Val Javier (Lyons, Jennifer)
April 21, 2021 Filing 9 Letter from Clerk's Office to Jennifer Lyons, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff Val Javier, dated April 21, 2021, Re: ECF No. #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS (jo)
April 21, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo)
April 21, 2021 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Office (jo)
April 21, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Social Security Administration (jo)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to U.S. Department of Justice (jo)
April 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re: #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 4/21/2021. (jo)
April 21, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - a certified copy of ECF #4 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS and the forms and/or documents identified in the Clerk's Letter will be served by First Class Mail to Jennifer Lyons, Esq., counsel for Plaintiff Val Javier at the address of record on April 21, 2021. The Order was served by interoffice mail to the U.S. Marshals Service on April 21, 2021. (jo)
April 20, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - Jennifer B. Lyons appearing for Plaintiff Val Javier. (emt, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00191 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 20, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Val Javier. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Proposed Summons, #3 Supplement Proposed Summons, #4 Supplement Proposed Summons, #5 Affidavit Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis)(Lyons, Jennifer) Modified on 4/21/2021 (jo)
April 20, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Identification of Person Filing Document - Please be advised that Documents #1 Complaint and #3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis filed by Val Javier do not include information that identifies the filer. The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, and email address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left corner of the first page of each document presented for filing. See L.R. 10.2 (b). No further action is necessary. (emt, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Javier v. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Val Javier
Represented By: Jennifer B. Lyons
Represented By: David B. Goetz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Rachel S. Moriyama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?