Nonaka v. Sam's West, Inc.
Plaintiff: Cara Nonaka
Defendant: John Does 1-10 and Sam's West, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Case Number: 1:2021cv00197
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Sam's West, Inc. (Notice of Deposition Upon Written Interrogatories--DBEDT) (Lezy, Normand)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 5/24/2021. (emt, )
May 24, 2021 Filing 10 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Mr. Hoffman reports Plaintiff has achieved medical stability. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 10/6/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. No submissions required. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Enter Access Code 2070326.Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Jury Selection/Trial is set for 8/29/2022 at 08:30 AM before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 7/19/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference is set for 5/26/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due 5/19/2022 to Trader_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 10/6/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 3/30/2022. Discovery due by 7/1/2022. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:05 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 9 EO: Dial-in instructions for the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 5/24/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader are listed below.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
May 17, 2021 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement by Sam's West, Inc.. (Lezy, Normand)
May 17, 2021 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement. (Hoffman, Rodger)
May 10, 2021 Filing 6 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Cara Nonaka. (Hoffman, Rodger)
May 3, 2021 Filing 5 REPORT of Planning Meeting PLAINTIFF'S REPORT OF THE CONFERENCE OF THE PARTIES. (Hoffman, Rodger)
April 23, 2021 Filing 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake on the court's website. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 5/24/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00197 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (emt, )
April 22, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Sam's West, Inc. from First Circuit Court, case number 1CCV-20-0000835. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2514568), filed by Sam's West, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 (Complaint; Summons - 1CCV-20-000835) , #2 Exhibit 2 (Defendant's Answer to Complaint filed June 8, 2020; Demand for Jury Trial - 1CCV-20-000835) , #3 Certificate of Service)(Lezy, Normand) Modified on 4/22/2021 (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nonaka v. Sam's West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sam's West, Inc. doing business as Sam's Club
Represented By: Normand R. Lezy
Represented By: Michael J. Nakano
Represented By: Shawn L.M. Benton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cara Nonaka
Represented By: Rodger I. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?