Porter v. Hilton Management LLC
Plaintiff: Michael L. Porter
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC, Jane Does 1-10, John Does 1-10, Doe Corporations 1-10, Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10, Doe Partnerships 1-10 and Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00246
Filed: May 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 23 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Management LLC Re: Defendant Hilton Management LLCS Initial Disclosures (Hughes, Thomas)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 6/28/2021. (jo)
June 28, 2021 Filing 21 AMENDED EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties amenable to early settlement discussions at appropriate time after required discovery.Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 11/2/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 10/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 7/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via video teleconference. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 7/21/2022 to Porter_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 11/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/27/2022. Discovery due by 8/26/2022. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:10 a.m.)(MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
June 28, 2021 Filing 20 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held.Discussion had. Parties amenable to early settlement discussions at appropriate time after required discovery. Court sets Confidential Telephone Conference for 11/2/2021 at 9:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Trader. Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-47352. Access Code 2070326Rule 16 Scheduling Order to issue.Dates given: Non-Jury Trial is set for 10/25/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 9/13/2022 at 09:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Settlement Conference is set for 7/28/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via video teleconference. Confidential Settlement Conference statements due by 7/21/2022 to Porter_Orders@hid.uscourts.gov Confidential Telephone Conference is set for 11/2/2021 at 09:30 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER. Dispositive Motions filed by 5/25/2022. Discovery due by 8/26/2022. (ATT / 9:00 - 9:10 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)
June 22, 2021 Filing 19 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael L. Porter (Chang, Roy)
June 22, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Attorney Filer- Please be advised that Document #17 Certificate of Service was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. The filing party shall use its discretion should they feel the necessity to re-submit corrected filings. (jo)
June 21, 2021 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement DEFENDANT HILTON MANAGEMENT LLCS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Hughes, Thomas)
June 17, 2021 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Michael L. Porter (Demetrakopoulos, Harvey)
June 10, 2021 Filing 16 CONSENT TO JURISDICTION BY UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE by Plaintiff Michael L. Porter and Defendant Hilton Management LLC Please continue to reflect case number CV 21-00246 RT on all further pleadings. (jo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Management LLC Defendant Hilton Management LLCs First Request for Production of Documents to Plaintiff Michael L. Porter (Hughes, Thomas)
June 8, 2021 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Hilton Management LLC Re: Defendant Hilton Management LLCs First Request for Answers to Interrogatories to Plaintiff Michael L. Porter (Hughes, Thomas)
June 8, 2021 Filing 13 Joinder re #10 Report of Planning Meeting DEFENDANT HILTON MANAGEMENT LLCS JOINDER AND NONOPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF MICHAEL L. PORTERS REPORT OF FRCP 26(F) PLANNING MEETING filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Ma, Stacy)
June 8, 2021 Filing 12 Consent Election Form
June 8, 2021 Filing 11 Plaintiff Michael L. Porter's Scheduling Conference Statement (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Demetrakopoulos, Harvey) Modified on 6/8/2021 (jo)
June 8, 2021 Filing 10 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Demetrakopoulos, Harvey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 9 Consent Election Form
May 26, 2021 Filing 8 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000525 (Attachments: #1 Case Detail Docket List, #2 Clerk's Certificate) (jni)
May 26, 2021 Filing 7 Consent Election Form
May 25, 2021 Filing 6 Defendant Hilton Management, LLC's ANSWER to Complaint and Certificate of Service by Hilton Management LLC.(Hughes, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. YOU MUST COMPLETE AND FILE THE ATTACHED ELECTION FORM. Each party must indicate consent or decline to consent by completing the attached Election Form and returning it to the Clerk's Office no later than twenty-one 21 days after entry of appearance.In the event a dispositive motion is filed prior to the date on which the submission of the Election Form is required, the parties must return the completed Election Form within seven (7) calendar days after the motion is filed. FILING INSTRUCTIONS: After completing the form, ALL registered CM/ECF participants are now required to e-file this document. Use the event Consent Election Form , found under Civil Events; Other Filings; Consent Election Form. All other parties MUST file the form by mail, or in person, at the Clerks Office: U.S. District Court, 300 Ala Moana Blvd Room C-338 Honolulu, HI 96850, Attention: Consent Clerk. The form can be found on the court's website http://www.hid.uscourts.gov ATTACH THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE NOTICE AND ELECTION FORM MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (jni)
May 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/28/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/25/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
May 25, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00246 RT on all further pleadings.(jni)
May 25, 2021 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hilton Management LLC. (Hughes, Thomas)
May 25, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Hilton Management LLC from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 1CCV-21-0000525. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2530514), filed by Hilton Management LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hughes, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Porter v. Hilton Management LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hilton Management LLC
Represented By: Andrew K. Recktenwald
Represented By: Thomas Joseph Hughes
Represented By: Stacy Y Ma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe "Non-Profit" Corporations 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Partnerships 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Roe Governmental Entities 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Porter
Represented By: Roy K.S. Chang
Represented By: Harvey M. Demetrakopoulos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?