Purcell et al v. Tapestry, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Dale Edward James Purcell and Deanna Purcell
Defendant: Does 1-10, Kate Spade LLC, Tapestry, Inc. and Doe Defendants 1-10
Case Number: 1:2021cv00250
Filed: May 26, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 28, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Dale Edward James Purcell, Deanna Purcell (re Plaintiffs' Joint Rule 26(a) Initial Disclosures) (Sunderland, Magali)
July 28, 2021 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Kate Spade LLC, Tapestry, Inc. Re: Defendants Tapestry, Inc. and Kate Spade LLC's Rule 26(a)(1)(A) Initial Disclosures (Harstad, William)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on June 30, 2021. (bbb)
June 28, 2021 Filing 10 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing. Dates given. Court to prepare Scheduling Order. Non-Jury Trial is set for 08/01/2022 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 06/21/2022 at 9:45 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Early Settlement Conference is set for 09/27/2021 at 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 05/02/2022 10:00 a.m. by Video Tele-Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Dispositive Motions filed by 03/02/2022. Discovery due by 06/03/2022. The Courtroom Manager will be sending out a separate email providing counsel detailed instructions regarding Settlement Conferences Video Tele-Conference (VTC) access prior to the conference date.Until further notice, all other hearings before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield, parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(AT&T Service / 9:36 - 9:43) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 24, 2021 Filing 9 EO: The Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 06/28/2021 at 9:30 a.m. will be held via telephone before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 21, 2021 Filing 8 Scheduling Conference Statement Defendants Tapestry, Inc. and Kate Spade LLC's Rule 16 Scheduling Conference Statement; Certificate of Service. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Wesley-Smith, Ian)
June 21, 2021 Filing 7 Scheduling Conference Statement Plaintiffs' Joint Scheduling Conference Statement. (Sunderland, Magali)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Rule 26(f) Report of the Parties' Planning Meeting. (Sunderland, Magali)
May 28, 2021 Filing 5 TRANSMITTAL of DOCUMENTS from the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii, 1CCV-21-0000367. (emt, )
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/28/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 5/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
May 26, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00250 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
May 26, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Kate Spade LLC, Tapestry, Inc. (Harstad, William)
May 26, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Kate Spade LLC, Tapestry, Inc. Defendants Tapestry, Inc. and Kate Spade LLC's Notice of Removal Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 1332 from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-21-0000367. ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2531549), filed by Kate Spade LLC, Tapestry, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of William M. Harstad, #2 Exhibit 1 - March 23, 2021 Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2 - Request to Exempt Case from the CAAP, #4 Exhibit 3 - Return and Acknowledgment of Service, #5 Exhibit 4 - Defendants' Answer to Complaint, #6 Declaration in Support of Removal, #7 Certificate of Service)(Harstad, William)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Purcell et al v. Tapestry, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kate Spade LLC
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tapestry, Inc.
Represented By: William M. Harstad
Represented By: Ian R. Wesley-Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Defendants 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Edward James Purcell
Represented By: Collin Marty Fritz
Represented By: Allen K. Williams
Represented By: Magali Sunderland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Deanna Purcell
Represented By: Douglas Thomas Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?