Salanoa v. DeWaele
Plaintiff: Christopher Salanoa
Defendant: Richard DeWaele
Case Number: 1:2021cv00266
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 12 Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Consent to Receive Documents and Notices of Electronic Filing by Email - by Christopher Salanoa. (Attachments: #1 Technical Guide re: NEFs)(emt, )
August 4, 2021 Filing 11 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-File) (Pro Se Non-Prisoner) - by Plaintiff Christopher Salanoa. (emt, )
July 27, 2021 Filing 10 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 08/02/2021 at 9:30 a.m. IS CONTINUED TO 08/23/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 08/16/2021. In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668(MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE of Service - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). This Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) was also emailed to Pro Se Plaintiff Christopher Salanoa at the email address that we have on record of ccsalanoa@gmail.com on 07/27/2021.
July 9, 2021 Filing 9 DECLARATION of Summons Being Resent to Defendant - filed by Christopher Salanoa. (emt, )
July 2, 2021 Filing 8 DECLARATION OF SUMMONS REFUSED - filed by Christopher Salanoa (jo)
June 17, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
June 17, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Richard DeWaele. (emt, )
June 15, 2021 Filing 5 Filing fee: $ 402, receipt number HI030801 re #1 Complaint. (emt, )
June 14, 2021 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) submitted by Christopher Salanoa. (emt, )
June 8, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Identification of Person Filing Document - Please be advised that Document #1 Complaint filed by Christopher Salanoa does not include information that identifies the filer. The name, Hawaii bar identification number, address, telephone number, and email address of counsel (or, if pro se, of the party), and the specific identification of each party represented by name and interest in the litigation (e.g., plaintiff, defendant, etc.) shall appear in the upper left corner of the first page of each document presented for filing. See L.R. 10.2 (b). ADVISORY ENTRY. Personal Identifiers - Please be advised that certain exhibits submitted in support of the #1 Complaint, filed by Christopher Salanoa, contains personal identifiers. To comply with the policy of the Judicial Conference of the United States and the E-Government Act of 2002, and to promote electronic access to case files while also protecting personal privacy and other legitimate interests, parties shall refrain from including or shall partially redact when inclusion is necessary. (emt, )
June 8, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry-No Identification, Personal Identifiers has been served by First Class Mail to Christopher Salanoa at 46-203 Aeloa Street, Kaneohe, HI 96744 (address of record in CV 21-00166 WRP; Salanoa v. USA) on June 8, 2021. (emt, )
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/7/2021. (emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Christopher Salanoa served. A blank IFP application was provided to Mr. Salanoa.
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 8/2/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/7/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures)(emt, )COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - Christopher Salanoa served.
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 LEGAL MALPRACTICE COMPLAINT ; Demand for Jury Trial; Summons (not included) against Richard DeWaele - filed by Christopher Salanoa. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H (RESTRICTED) , #9 Exhibit I)(emt, ) Modified on 6/8/2021 Exhibit H has been restricted to "case participants". (emt, ).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Salanoa v. DeWaele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard DeWaele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Salanoa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?