Pauline v. Espinda
Plaintiff: Elden Pauline
Defendant: Nolan Espinda, Warden, Cus Evans, Capt Strong, RSS Rabaca, Keawe, Santos, Sergeants, Murray and Smith
Interested Party: Shelley Harrington and Laurie Nadamoto
Case Number: 1:2021cv00336
Filed: August 6, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 24, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 24, 2021 Filing 14 ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT by the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re #12 ORDER OF REMAND (jo)
September 16, 2021 Filing 13 Transmittal Letter to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii re: ECF No. #12 ORDER OF REMAND, dated September 16, 2021 (jo)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REMAND - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/16/2021. This action is REMANDED to the Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii. Any pending motions are DENIED as moot. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to close the file and terminate this action. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Elden Pauline will be served by First Class Mail on September 17, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF).
September 15, 2021 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT - "This Motion Is To Inform The Court Of The Unconstitutional And Due Process Violations That Is Going On To Me Out of Retaliations By Defendants" re: #5 , #6 - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 15, 2021 Filing 10 SUPPLEMENT - "This Motion Is To Please Request For The Court To Take Actions Basis On The Health And Safety Issues That Is Going On And the Constitutional Due Process Violations That Is Going On To Me Out Of Retaliation" re: #5 , #6 - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 15, 2021 Filing 9 SUPPLEMENT - "This Motion Is For the Court to Look at This Exhibits A B C" - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 15, 2021 Filing 8 APPLICATION To Proceed In Forma Pauperis By A Prisoner - filed by Plaintiff Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Transmittal Letter, #2 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 7 STATEMENT of Complaint - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for Hearing Basis on the Health and Safety Violations and The Concerns That I State in the Complaint and In This Motion to the Court - filed by Plaintiff Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for Protective Order - filed by Plaintiff Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 4 SUPPLEMENT re: #1 - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 Filing 3 SUPPLEMENT re: #1 - filed by Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Mailing Envelope) (jo)
September 1, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - copies of ECF Nos. #3 , #4 , #5 , #6 , and #7 will be served by First Class Mail to Elden Pauline at the address of record on September 2, 2021. (jo)
August 10, 2021 COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Copies of ECF Nos. #1 and #2 will be served by First Class Mail to Elden Pauline at the address of record on August 10, 2021. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jo)
August 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/6/2021. (jo)
August 6, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, State of Hawaii; Case Number: 1CCV-21-0000343 - filed by Alden Elden Pauline (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Mailing Envelope) (jo) Modified on 8/10/2021 (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pauline v. Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elden Pauline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nolan Espinda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cus Evans
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Capt Strong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RSS Rabaca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keawe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergeants
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Shelley Harrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Laurie Nadamoto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?