Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC v. Kodama
Plaintiff: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Defendant: Alan Kodama
Case Number: 1:2021cv00347
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: ROM TRADER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Defend Trade Secrets Act (of 2016)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 30 EO: In light of the Stipulation for entry of preliminary injunction and order (Dkt. No. #29 ) and the Minutes for the further confidential mediation (Dkt. No. #28 ), the motion for temporary restraining order (Dkt. No. #4 ) is deemed withdrawn and terminated as such. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(rls, )
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 STIPULATION FOR ENTRY OF PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION AND ORDER; (EXHIBIT A) - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/13/2021. (emt, )
September 11, 2021 Filing 28 EP: Further Confidential Mediation held by VTC.Edward Magarian, Esq. and Mr. Edward Walton, Vice President & Group Counsel for Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, participated by video teleconference ("VTC"). Mr. Alan Kodama and Kimberley Cronin, Esq. participated by VTC.By agreement of the parties, case has settled. A stipulated injunction and agreement to be filed by 10:00 a.m. on Monday, 9/13/2021.Pending dates and deadlines are hereby vacated.All Motions are deemed withdrawn based upon this settlement. (VTC-No Record / 10a-1215p) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(tl)
September 10, 2021 Filing 27 EP: In-Person Confidential Mediation held.Edward Magarian, Esq. and Mr. Edward Walton, Vice President & Group Counsel for Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC, participated by video teleconference (VTC). Mr. Alan Kodama present. Kimberley Cronin, Esq. participated by VTC.Further confidential mediation to be conducted by VTC is set for September 11, 2021 at 10:00 am before the Honorable Barry M. Kurren. Courtroom manager to provide the Parties with VTC connection information. (VTC-No Record/10a-540p) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(tl)
September 7, 2021 Filing 26 EP: Telephonic Status Conference regarding mediation held.A Mediation has been set for 9/10/2021 at 9:30am before the Honorable Barry M. Kurren, at the U.S. District Courthouse, 2nd floor.Each party is responsible for setting up their own Zoom meeting and the connection of their participants on the day of the mediation.Counsel to submit a confidential memo stating the expectations of the mediation, to BMK@hid.uscourts.gov, by Thursday 9/9/2021. (ATT-No Record/330p-345p) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(tl)
September 7, 2021 Filing 25 EO: A Telephonic Status Conference has been set for 9/7/2021 at 3:30 PM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN.Parties are to participate via the court's AT&T teleconference services. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. Participant Instructions: Step 1: Dial 1-888-684-8852. Step 2: Enter "4890755#"(Access Code followed by the pound (#) sign)". Step 3: Participant will hear system say "To join the conference as host press star (*), otherwise press pound (#). Enter '#'." System will then say "The host has not yet arrived. Please stand by." Participant should continue to hold until the Host arrives. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE BARRY M. KURREN)(tl)
September 7, 2021 Filing 24 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. Alan Kodama served on 8/25/2021. (Lam, Michael)
September 3, 2021 Filing 23 EP: #4 Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order held by video conference.Defendant Alan Kodama present by video conference.Discussion held re the Court's inclination and the possibility of mediating this case with the assistance of one of the magistrate judges.Before close of business on September 7, 2021, counsel to notify the court as to their clients' willingness to proceed through mediation before a magistrate judge.(Reporter-Gloria Bediamol) (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 Declaration of Michael L. Lam re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order , #21 Response in Support of Motion . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Certificate of Service)(Lam, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2021 (emt, ).
September 1, 2021 Filing 21 REPLY in Support of #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Lam, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Lam, Michael) Modified on 9/7/2021 (emt, ).
August 30, 2021 Filing 20 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DEFENDANT'S MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF AMERIPRISE FINANCIAL SERVICES, LLC'S MOTION FOR A TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER; DECLARATION OF ALAN KODAMA; EXHIBITS 1-7; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Alan Kodama. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Kodama, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Exhibit 6, #8 Exhibit 7, #9 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise)
August 27, 2021 Filing 19 EO: Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC initiated this suit and filed for a temporary restraining order ("TRO") on August 16, 2021. Dkt. Nos. 1, 4. The Court gave Defendant Alan Kodama until August 25, 2021 to respond to the TRO motion. Dkt. No. 8. On August 25, 2021, Kodama filed an Ex Parte motion for an extension of time to respond. Dkt. No. 14. Ameriprise filed its opposition to that motion on August 26, 2021. Dkt. No. 17. Having considered the motion and response, the urgency of the underlying TRO motion alleged by Ameriprise, and for good cause appearing, Kodama's motion for an extension, Dkt. No. 14, is GRANTED in part to the following extent: Kodama's response to the TRO must be filed by no later than August 30, 2021. Any reply must be filed by no later than September 1, 2021. Hearing on the TRO motion, previously set for August 31, 2021, is postponed to September 3, 2021 at 9:30 a.m., by video teleconference. The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-32072. Enter your Access Code (1607055636)The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. IT IS SO ORDERED.(JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 26, 2021 Filing 18 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Alan Kodama re #13 EX PARTE Motion to Extend Deadlines and Hearing Date for the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Filed on August 16, 2021 [Dkt. 4], #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FILED O AMENDED CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (Ing, Louise)
August 26, 2021 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #14 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FILED O filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Michael L. Lam, #2 Declaration of Lowen Young, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Certificate of Service)(Lam, Michael)
August 26, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Laura P. Moritz on behalf of Alan Kodama on behalf of Alan Kodama. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Moritz, Laura)
August 26, 2021 Filing 15 EO: On August 25, 2021, Defendant Alan Kodama filed #13 a motion to extend the deadline to respond to a temporary restraining order ("TRO"). Kodama's position is that he was only recently served and so needs additional time to respond. See Dkt. No. 13. Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC must respond to Kodama's motion by no later than August 27, 2021. No reply is permitted. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 25, 2021 Filing 14 Ex Parte MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FILED ON AUGUST 16, 2021 [DKT. 4]; DECLARATION OF ALAN KODAMA; DECLARATION OF LOUISE K.Y. ING; ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANT'S EX PARTE MOTION TO EXTEND DEADLINES AND HEARING DATE FOR THE MOTION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER, FILED ON AUGUST 16, 2021 [DKT. 4]; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Defendant Alan Kodama (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Kodama, #2 Declaration of Louise K.Y. Ing, #3 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise)
August 25, 2021 Filing 13 (Document refiled, see ECF No. #14 ): EX PARTE Motion to Extend Deadlines and Hearing Date for the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Filed on August 16, 2021 [Dkt. 4] Louise K.Y. Ing appearing for Defendant Alan Kodama (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alan Kodama, #2 Declaration of Louise K.Y. Ing, #3 Order Granting Ex Parte Motion, #4 Certificate of Service)(Ing, Louise) Modified on 8/26/2021 (emt, ).
August 25, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. No E-Service of Ex Parte Motion- Please be advised that viewing access to Document #13 EX PARTE Motion to Extend Deadlines and Hearing Date for the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, Filed on August 16, 2021 [Dkt. 4] filed by Alan Kodama, is restricted to the filing party and the court (filing events from the "Ex Parte" Filings Category, will restrict viewing of the entry to the court and the filing party). The Certificate of Service reflects that service was made electronically through CM/ECF. The filing party may refile the entry as a public document by selecting a filing event from the "motions" category. Alternatively, an amended certificate of service may be filed. (emt, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO TREVOR BROWN [DKT. #10 ] - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/18/2021. (emt, )
August 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO EDWARD B. MAGARIAN [DKT. #9 ] - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER on 8/18/2021. (emt, )
August 18, 2021 ADVISORY ENTRY. Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Documents #9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Edward B. Magarian and #10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Trevor Brown filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC require the court's approval. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the proposed orders in Microsoft Word format to Magistrate Judge Rom Trader at trader_orders@hid.uscourts.gov. Additionally, the filing party may refer to the CM/ECF Procedures Guide, Section 10.4 - Emailing of Proposed Orders for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (emt, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Trevor Brown Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2567001.Michael L. Lam appearing for Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Trevor Brown)(Lam, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Edward B. Magarian Filing fee $ 300, receipt number 0975-2566984.Michael L. Lam appearing for Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Edward B. Magarian, #2 Attachment to Declaration)(Lam, Michael)
August 17, 2021 Filing 8 EO: Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC's Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order, Dkt. No. 4, is set for hearing on August 31, 2021 at 10:30 a.m. via video teleconference ("VTC"), before the Honorable Judge Derrick K. Watson. The Court sets the following briefing schedule: any response shall be filed no later than August 25, 2021; any reply shall be filed by no later than August 27, 2021.The courtroom manager will provide the participants with instructions and information to connect by video prior to the scheduled VTC. Participants must connect to the VTC at least ten (10) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing. All participants shall mute their lines until directed to speak by the Court. All attorneys participating in the hearing are directed to refrain from using speaker phones. The public may attend this conference (audio only) with the information provided below:1. Dial 1-650-479-32072. Enter your Access Code (1607055636)The Court reminds all participants that they are strictly prohibited from recording or broadcasting any hearing, in whole or in part, in any fashion. As of this order, Plaintiff has not provided the Court with proof that the complaint and TRO Motion have been served on Defendant. Accordingly, Plaintiff must forthwith serve those documents on Defendant and provide the Court proof of such service. IT IS SO ORDERED. (JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON)(tyk)
August 17, 2021 Filing 7 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(emt, )
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 10/18/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/17/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (emt, )
August 17, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Alan Kodama. (emt, )
August 16, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Steven E. Tom appearing for Plaintiff Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Gary Gassmann, #3 Exhibit A to Declaration of Gary Gassmann, #4 Exhibit B to Declaration of Gary Gassmann, #5 Exhibit C to Declaration of Gary Gassmann, #6 Declaration of Edward Magarian, #7 Exhibit A to Declaration of Edward Magarian, #8 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Edward Magarian, #9 Exhibit Exhibit C to Declaration of Edward Magarian, #10 Notice of Motion, #11 Certificate of Word Count)(Tom, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Tom, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Tom, Steven)
August 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Alan Kodama ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2566590.), filed by Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Civil Cover Sheet)(Tom, Steven)
August 16, 2021 NOTICE of Case Assignment; Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00347DKW-RT on all further pleadings. (apg, )

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC v. Kodama
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ameriprise Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Steven E. Tom
Represented By: Edward B. Magarian
Represented By: Michael L. Lam
Represented By: Trevor Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alan Kodama
Represented By: Louise K.Y. Ing
Represented By: Laura P. Moritz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?