Botelho v. Wagner et al
Plaintiff: Cyril K. Botelho
Defendant: Rebecca Siegel Wagner and DTRIC Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00388
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 9, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 EO: The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/15/2021 at 09:00AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER is CONTINUED to 1/20/2022 at 09:00AM. Scheduling Conference Statements must be filed by 1/13/2022.Parties and other participants must call-in at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the conference. Call-in instructions are below:1. Dial 1-888-363-4735.2. Access Code 2070326. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(laa)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
September 27, 2021 Filing 5 Mail Returned as Undeliverable, Unable to Forward sent to Cyril K. Botelho re: ECF #4 (jo)
September 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS, ECF NO. #2 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/16/2021. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Cyril K. Botelho has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the (NEF).
September 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/15/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 9/15/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures)(jni)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Cyril Botelho will be served by First Class Mail on September 16, 2021 to the address of record listed on the (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
September 15, 2021 Filing 2 Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Cyril K. Botelho. (jni)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against All Defendants - filed by Cyril K. Botelho. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Botelho v. Wagner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cyril K. Botelho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Siegel Wagner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DTRIC Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?