Espinoza-Santos v. United States of America
Petitioner: Noel Espinoza-Santos
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 1:2021cv00414
Filed: October 14, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 10, 2021 Filing 4 Petition Writ of Habeas Corpus: $ 5.00,receipt number HI031635 (ej)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING MOTION TO SET ASIDE/VACATE SENTENCE AND/OR CONVICTION PURSUANT TO 28U.S.C. 2241 re #1 . Espinoza-Santos previously filed a 2255 motion in the Northern District of Texas, which was denied. If he would like to file a new 2255 motion, he must not only file it in the Northern District of Texas, he must also obtain, before any such filing, a certification from the Fifth Circuit permitting him to file a second or successive 2255 motion. See 28 U.S.C. 2255(h). No matter what, he cannot proceed with a 2255 motion in the District of Hawaii that seeks relief from his conviction in the Northern District of Texas. This court denies Espinoza-Santos's present motion and directs the Clerk of Court to close this case. This ruling makes it unnecessary for this court to address the request for appointment of counsel. Signed by JUDGE SUSAN OKI MOLLWAY on 10/15/2021. (cib)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/14/2021. (jo)
October 14, 2021 Filing 1 MOTION to Set Aside/Vacate Sentence and/or Conviction Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241, and Appointment of Counsel Pursuant to U.S.C. 18 3006A For Good Cause Shown Herein - filed by Noel Espinoza-Santos (Attachments: #1 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Espinoza-Santos v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Noel Espinoza-Santos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?