Allstate Insurance Company v. Ganitano et al
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Defendant: Joel G. Ganitano and Arlene C. Ganitano
Case Number: 1:2021cv00416
Filed: October 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 16, 2021 Filing 15 EO: In light of the #14 Entry of Default, the Court VACATES the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 01/25/2022. Plaintiff shall seek default judgment no later than 01/14/2022. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm2)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Joel G. Ganitano, Arlene C. Ganitano, pursuant to ECF #13 Request for Entry of Default. (jni)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 Request for Entry of Default by Allstate Insurance Company. (Smith, Katie)
November 23, 2021 Filing 12 EO: At the Plaintiff's request, to allow more time for Defendant's to answer, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 12/20/2021 IS CONTINUED TO 01/25/2022 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 01/18/2022. Plaintiff's counsel to notify the parties.In accordance with the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii's latest Temporary General Order Regarding District of Hawaii Response to COVID-19 Emergency and the Order Authorizing the Use of Telephonic and Video Hearings, due to the ongoing COVID-19 pandemic and public health emergency, including the anticipated long term need to maintain certain social distancing and other measures intended to protect the public, court employees, and counsel from being exposed to the COVID-19 virus, while at the same time regulating civil matters in a manner consistent with equity and fairness, the hearing will be held telephonically. Parties are to participate via telephone through our AT&T Service. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-877-848-7030Access Code is 2123668 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
October 27, 2021 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Arlene C. Ganitano served on 10/26/2021. (Miller, Richard)
October 27, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Allstate Insurance Company. Joel G. Ganitano served on 10/26/2021. (Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2021 Filing 9 First Amended Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
October 19, 2021 Filing 8 Summons (Proposed) (Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2021 Filing 7 First AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Arlene C. Ganitano, Joel G. Ganitano, filed by Allstate Insurance Company.(Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2021 Filing 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Allstate Insurance Company. (Miller, Richard)
October 19, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (jni)
October 19, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
October 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 12/20/2021 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 10/19/2021. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
October 19, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 21-00416 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings.(jni)
October 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY RELIEF against Arlene C. Ganitano, Joel G. Ganitano ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0975-2594147.), filed by Allstate Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Miller, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Allstate Insurance Company v. Ganitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allstate Insurance Company
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Represented By: Katie Lauren Smith
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Joel G. Ganitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arlene C. Ganitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?