DeJesus v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Danny DeJesus
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc. and First Premier Bank
Case Number: 1:2022cv00016
Filed: January 11, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681 Fair Credit Reporting Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 8, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SETTING SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/8/2022. (eta)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING EARLY SETTLEMENT CONFERENCE - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/8/2022. (eta)
March 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 3/8/2022. (eta)
March 8, 2022 Filing 20 EP: TELEPHONIC RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCEMr. Yaakov Saks appeared for plaintiff.Ms. Deborah Wright appeared for defendants. The Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued.Discussion held regarding consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. Jury Selection/Trial is set for 08:30 AM on 3/13/2023 before JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 1/31/2023 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference is set for 12/15/2022 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 10/12/2022. Discovery due by 1/13/2023. Other Matters: An Early Settlement Conference is set for July 12, 2022 at 11:00 a.m. via Video Teleconference (VTC) before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. The Court to provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Settlement Conference Statement shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by July 5, 2022.(ATT / 9:00 - 9:12 a.m.) (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
March 1, 2022 Filing 19 EO: In light of the Notice of Settlement as to Defendant First Premier Bank, see ECF No. 15, Defendant First Premier Bank is not required to participate in or file a scheduling conference statement in advance of the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9:00 AM on 3/8/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 28, 2022 Filing 18 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Saks, Yaakov)
February 28, 2022 Filing 17 Scheduling Conference Statement of Defendant Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wright, Deborah)
February 23, 2022 Filing 16 EO: Plaintiff has informed the Court that he has reached a settlement with Defendant First Premier Bank. See ECF No. 15. Stipulation for Dismissal shall be submitted to Watson_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by no later than April 25, 2022. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)
February 22, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE by Danny DeJesus of Settlement as to First Premier Bank Danny DeJesus. (Saks, Yaakov)
February 21, 2022 Filing 14 REPORT of Planning Meeting . (Saks, Yaakov)
February 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FOR DEFENDANT EXPERIAN INFORMATION SOLUTIONS, INC. TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF DANNY DEJESUS' COMPLAINT, FILED JANUARY 11, 2022 (DOCKET 1); ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 2/11/2022. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. answer due 3/15/2022. (eta)
February 11, 2022 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Experian Information Solutions, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Experian plc, Other Affiliate Central Source LLC, Other Affiliate Online Data Exchange LLC, Other Affiliate New Management Services LLC, Other Affiliate VantageScore Solutions LLC, Other Affiliate Opt-Out Services LLC for Experian Information Solutions, Inc... (Wright, Deborah)
February 11, 2022 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Deborah K. Wright on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc. on behalf of Experian Information Solutions, Inc.. (Wright, Deborah)
January 17, 2022 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Danny DeJesus. First Premier Bank served on 1/13/2022. (Saks, Yaakov)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO YAAKOV SAKS re #3 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 1/12/2022. (eta)
January 11, 2022 Filing 8 Summons Issued as to First Premier Bank. (jni)
January 11, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (jni)
January 11, 2022 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 3/8/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 1/11/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
January 11, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00016 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
January 11, 2022 Filing 3 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [Yaakov Saks, Esq.] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2628732.Blake Goodman appearing for Plaintiff Danny DeJesus (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A )(Goodman, Blake) Modified on 1/12/2022 (eta).
January 11, 2022 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) for Experian Information Solutions, Inc. (Attachments: #1 First Premier (Proposed) Summons)(Goodman, Blake) Modified on 1/12/2022 (eta).
January 11, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Demand for Jury Trial against Experian Information Solutions, Inc., First Premier Bank ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2628724.), filed by Danny DeJesus. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Goodman, Blake) Docket Text Modified on 1/11/2022 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeJesus v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danny DeJesus
Represented By: Blake Goodman
Represented By: Yaakov Saks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Deborah K. Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: First Premier Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?