LaPuente, Jr. v. Derr
Petitioner: Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr.
Respondent: Ms. Estella Derr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00119
Filed: March 23, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 18, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 18, 2022 Filing 10 Petitioner's RESPONSE to #9 Answer to Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 - filed by Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr. (Attachments: #1 FSA Recidivism Risk Assessment, #2 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
May 11, 2022 Filing 9 RESPONSE re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus ; COS filed by Estella Derr. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Harry Yee, #2 Declaration of Kris Robl, #3 Exhibit "A", #4 Exhibit "B", #5 Exhibit "C", #6 Exhibit "D", #7 Exhibit "E", #8 Exhibit "F", #9 Exhibit "G")(Yee, Harry)
April 18, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Harry Yee on behalf of Estella Derr on behalf of Estella Derr. (Yee, Harry)
April 11, 2022 Filing 7 Motion in Support of #1 Petitioner's Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
March 30, 2022 Filing 5 EO: On March 23, 2022, the Court received Petitioner Jourdan L. LaPuente, Jr.'s Petition Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for a Writ of Habeas Corpus [ECF No. 1]. The Court received Petitioner's filing fee for this action on March 28, 2022 [ECF No. 4]. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before May 11, 2022, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before June 8, 2022. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(jp)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
March 30, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of 5 Entering Order shall be served by First Class Mail to Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr. at the address of record on March 30, 2022. A copy of the 5 Entering Order and #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus shall be served by through interoffice delivery to the U.S. Attorneys Office on March 30, 2022. (eta)
March 28, 2022 Filing 6 Letter to Clerk from Petitioner Jourdan LaPuente, Jr. Re: Return of file-stamped copies of documents. (Attachments: #1 Petitioner's copies of filed Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #2 Petitioner's copies of Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Funds, #3 Petitioner's copy of Habeas Deficiency Order, #4 Petitioner's copy of IFP Application and instructions, #5 copy of envelope, #6 Mailing Documentation) (eta)
March 28, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI032375 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (eta)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 3/23/2022. (jni)
March 23, 2022 Filing 2 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds submitted by Petitioner Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr. to the Federal Bureau of Prisons, dated March 6, 2022. (jni)
March 23, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 for Writ of Habeas Corpus - filed by Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Mailing Envelope)(jni)
March 23, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of the file stamped #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, receive-stamped copy of #2 Request for Withdrawal of Inmate's Personal Funds, and file stamped #3 Habeas Deficiency Order has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record on 3/23/2022. An Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner, with instructions, were included in the mailing to Petitioner. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: LaPuente, Jr. v. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jourdan J. LaPuente, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Ms. Estella Derr
Represented By: Harry Yee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?