Patrick Opunui, Jr. v. Patrick Engleman
Petitioner: Patrick Opunui, Jr.
Respondent: James Engleman
Case Number: 1:2022cv00195
Filed: April 26, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2022 Filing 10 CLERK'S JUDGMENT entered on 5/27/2022 pursuant to ECF #9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION. (jni)
May 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER DISMISSING ACTION re #1 - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 5/27/2022. For the reasons stated herein, this habeas action is HEREBY DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.(jni)
May 31, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #9 Order Dismissing Action, and #10 Clerk's Judgment, shall be served by First Class Mail to Patrick Opunui, Jr. at the address of record on 5/31/2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (jni)
April 27, 2022 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 4/26/2022. (eta)
April 26, 2022 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record for CV No. 22-2642-JLS-AGR; Patrick Opunui vs. James Engleman, from the U.S. District Court for the Central District of California (Western Division). Please be advised that U.S. District Judge Jill A. Otake and U.S. Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield have been assigned to the instant case. Accordingly, please reflect Civil Case Number CV 22-00195 JAO-KJM on all further filings. (eta)
April 26, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 22-00195 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
April 26, 2022 Filing 4 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:22-cv-02642. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
April 26, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #3 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS ACTION TO DISTRICT OF HAWAII, 5 Notice of Case Assignment and 6 Notice to Parties was served through interoffice delivery, to the U.S. Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii on April 26, 2022. The 5 Notice of Case Assignment and 6 Notice to Parties has been served to Patrick Opunui, Jr. at the address of record on April 26, 2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (eta)
April 26, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #7 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER has been served by First Class Mail to Patrick Opunui, Jr. at the address of record on April 26, 2022. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions shall be included in the mailing to Petitioner. (eta)
April 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER TRANSFERRING HABEAS ACTION TO DISTRICT OF HAWAII by Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and 28 U.S.C. 1631, the Court ORDERS that the case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. (see document for further details). Original file, certified copy of the transfer order and docket sheet sent electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (hr) [Transferred from California Central on 4/26/2022.]
April 22, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (Attachments: #1 CV111/CV69) (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/26/2022.]
April 19, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person In Federal Custody (28:2241), filed by Petitioner Patrick Opunui, Jr. Case assigned to Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil) [Transferred from California Central on 4/26/2022.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Patrick Opunui, Jr. v. Patrick Engleman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Patrick Opunui, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Engleman
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?