Kaneakua v. Derr et al
Plaintiff: Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua and Elijah M. Kaneakua
Defendant: Estela Derr and Dr. Kwon
Case Number: 1:2022cv00201
Filed: April 29, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 27, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 27, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DIRECTING SERVICE OF PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/27/2022. (eta)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER re #5 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/10/2022. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Elijah M. Kaneakua has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on May 10, 2022. The order has been served electronically to the Finance Department for the District of Hawaii. A copy of the order shall be served by First Class Mail to the Federal Bureau of Prisons at 320 First St., NW, Washington, DC 20534 and to the Warden and Financial Office of FDC Honolulu at P. O. Box 30547, Honolulu, HI 96820 on May 10, 2022.
May 9, 2022 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis - by Plaintiff Elijah M. Kaneakua (eta) Modified on 5/9/2022 (eta).
May 9, 2022 Filing 4 ORIGINAL SIGNATURE of Elijah M. Kaneakua submitted for #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
May 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS BY A PRISONER re #2 - Signed by JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/2/2022. Kaneakua is therefore DIRECTED to submit a complete IFP Application that includes account statements from appropriate officials at each prison where he was confined during the six-month period immediately preceding the filing of this action. Failure to do so on or before June 3, 2022, will result in automatic dismissal of this suit without prejudice. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(b); see also Olivares v. Marshall, 59 F.3d 109, 112 (9th Cir. 1995). The court will take no action on any future filings until Kaneakua pays the filing fee or is granted IFP status. The Clerk is DIRECTED to send Kaneakua an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis to facilitate his compliance with this Order. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on May 2, 2022. A blank Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner and its instructions shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff.
April 29, 2022 Filing 2 APPLICATION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by a Prisoner - by Plaintiff Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua (eta)
April 29, 2022 Filing 1 (unsigned) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against All Defendants - filed by Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Mailing Documentation)(eta)
April 29, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of Advisory Entry-No Signature, shall be served by First Class Mail to Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua at the address of record on May 2, 2022. A file-stamped copy of the unsigned Complaint, IFP Application and a "business reply" envelope shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff. (eta)
April 29, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY. No Signature - Please be advised that Document #1 Prisoner Civil Rights Complaint, filed by Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua, is not signed. The Plaintiff is instructed to sign the enclosed copy of the complaint and return it to the Clerk's Office in the enclosed "business reply" envelope. (eta) Modified on 4/29/2022 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kaneakua v. Derr et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah Maluhia Kaneakua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elijah M. Kaneakua
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estela Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Kwon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?