Perez v. Derr
Plaintiff: Frankie Emillian Perez
Defendant: Estela Derr
Case Number: 1:2022cv00241
Filed: June 2, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federal)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2022 Filing 5 EO: On June 2, 2022, the court received Petitioner Frankie Emillian Perez's Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus Under 28 U.S.C. 2241 [ECF No. 1]. After the court issued an Entering Order [ECF No. 3] dismissing this action because Petitioner failed to pay the filing fee or submit an in forma pauperis application, Petitioner paid the required fee for this action [ECF No. 4]. The Clerk of Court is therefore DIRECTED to reopen this case. The government is ORDERED to file an Answer to the Petition on or before September 2, 2022, pursuant to Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner may file an optional Reply on or before September 30, 2022. The Clerk of Court is further DIRECTED to serve a copy of this Entering Order and the Petition on the United States Attorney's Office for the District of Hawaii. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
July 22, 2022 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed on 06/02/2022, and 5 Entering Order, filed on 07/22/2022, have been served by email on Rachel Moriyama, Chief, Civil Division at rachel.moriyama@usdoj.gov on 07/22/2022. Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically at the e-mail address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). (rlfh)
July 18, 2022 Filing 4 Filing fee: $ 5, receipt number HI033040 re #1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, (jzl)
July 14, 2022 Filing 3 EO: For reasons stated in the attached Minute Order:The Clerk is DIRECTED to: (1) ENTER JUDGMENT in favor of the Respondent and against Petitioner, dismissing this action without prejudice; and (2) CLOSE the case. IT IS SO ORDERED. (CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT)(rlfh)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
June 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 HABEAS DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 6/2/2022. (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Frankie Emillan Perez will be served by First Class Mail on June 3, 2022 to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). A blank prisoner in forma pauperis application is included in this mailing.
June 2, 2022 Filing 1 PETITION FOR A WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS UNDER 28 U.S.C. 2241 - filed by Frankie Emillian Perez Note: Attachment A is restricted as it contains personal identifiers (Attachments: #1 "A", #2 "B", #3 "C", #4 "D", #5 Mailing Envelope) (jo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Perez v. Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frankie Emillian Perez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estela Derr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?