Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Plaintiff: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Case Number: 1:2022cv00372
Filed: August 10, 2022
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2022 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. RE: (1) CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT OF PLAINTIFF ALOHA PETROLEUM, LTD.; AND (2) ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Heihre, C.)
August 15, 2022 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.. (Heihre, C.)
August 15, 2022 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA served on 8/11/2022. (Heihre, C.)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO John M. Sylvester, Esq. re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2022.John M. Sylvester, Esq. added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (jni)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO Hudson M. Stoner, Esq. re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/15/2022.Hudson M. Stoner added as attorney Pro Hac Vice for Plaintiff Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (jni)
August 12, 2022 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (John M. Sylvester) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2721590.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Plaintiff Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John M. Sylvester, #2 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to John M. Sylvester)(Heihre, C.)
August 12, 2022 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Hudson M. Stoner) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2721586.C. Michael Heihre appearing for Plaintiff Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Hudson M. Stoner, #2 Order Granting Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Hudson M. Stoner)(Heihre, C.)
August 12, 2022 ADVISORY ENTRY-Submission of Proposed Orders - Please be advised that Documents #10 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Hudson M. Stoner), and #11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice (John M. Sylvester) includes proposed orders that require the judge's signature. If the filing party has not already done so, please email the documents in Microsoft Word format to the applicable chambers' email address. See Section 10.4- Emailing of Proposed Orders and Stipulations to Chambers, of the CM/ECF Procedures Guide for additional instructions and a list of judge's email addresses. (jni)
August 11, 2022 Filing 9 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(otake1)
August 10, 2022 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons) (jo)
August 10, 2022 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (jo)
August 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference for 09:00 AM on 10/12/2022 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE J. MICHAEL SEABRIGHT on 8/10/2022. (Attachments: #1 Memo from Clerk Re: Corporate Disclosures) ATTACH THE ORDER SETTING RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE ORDER AND MEMO RE: CORPORATE DISCLOSURES MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jo)
August 10, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil Case Number CV 22-00372 JAO-WRP on all further pleadings. (jo)
August 10, 2022 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. identifying Corporate Parent Sunoco LP for Aloha Petroleum, Ltd... (Heihre, C.)
August 10, 2022 Filing 3 CIVIL Cover Sheet by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.. (Heihre, C.)
August 10, 2022 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Heihre, C.)
August 10, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2719841.), filed by Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Demand for Jury Trial)(Heihre, C.)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd. v. National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aloha Petroleum, Ltd.
Represented By: Michi Momose
Represented By: C. Michael Heihre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?