Davis v. Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association et al
Plaintiff: Kent Davis
Defendant: Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association, Kula Kai View Estates Community Road Association, Randy Larson, State of Hawai'i, Hawaii County Police Department and Kelden Waltgen
Case Number: 1:2023cv00346
Filed: August 17, 2023
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Office: Hawaii Office
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1332 Diversity-Libel,Assault,Slander
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 5, 2025. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 5, 2023 Filing 16 Clerk's Office Transmittal Letter to Plaintiff Kent Davis regarding ECF No. #13 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, AND (2) DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT, dated September 5, 2023. (eta)
September 5, 2023 Filing 15 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
September 5, 2023 Filing 14 Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (eta)
September 5, 2023 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #13 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, AND (2) DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT and the forms identified in the order, have been served by First Class Mail to Kent Davis at the address of record on September 5, 2023. A copy of the #13 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, AND (2) DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT was served by email to the U.S. Marshals Service on September 5, 2023. (eta)
September 1, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS, AND (2) DIRECTING SERVICE OF THE COMPLAINT re #2 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/1/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Kent Davis shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 5, 2023.
August 22, 2023 Filing 12 EO: The Court VACATES the Status Conference set for 10/16/2023. The Court will schedule a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference as appropriate. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Kent Davis shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 22, 2023.
August 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/18/2023. ( Status Conference - DJ is set for 10/16/2023 09:00 AM in Telephonic Hearing before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER.) (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Kent Davis shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 21, 2023.
August 17, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES: The Clerk of Court for the U.S. District Court, District of Hawaii gives notice of its receipt of the electronic case record of civil case 5:23-cv-01482-SSS-JC; Davis v. Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association, et al., transferred from the Central District of California (Eastern Division, Riverside). Please be advised that Chief U.S. District Judge Derrick K. Watson and U.S. Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter have been assigned to this case. Please reflect Civil Case Number: 1:23-cv-00346 DKW-WRP on all further filings. Please refer to the Court's website, www.hid.uscourts.gov for additional information and resources. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Kent Davis shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 21, 2023.
August 17, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00346 DKW-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Kent Davis shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 21, 2023.
August 17, 2023 Filing 8 Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 5:23-cv-01482. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
August 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING ACTION TO THE UNITED STATES DISTRICT COURT FOR THE DISTRICT OF HAWAII by Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes. Thus, this action is transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lom) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]
August 10, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error the above case was assigned as a Discovery in error. The case will be assigned as a 42 USC 1983; a 194 filing. The case will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 5:23-cv-01482 SSS(JC). (rn) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 5 Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]
July 31, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]
July 26, 2023 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kent Davis. (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.] Modified on 8/17/2023 (eta).
July 26, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Employees Hawaii County Police Department, Kula Kai View Estates Community Road Association, Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association, Randy Larson, State of Hawaii, Kelden Waltgen. Case assigned to Judge Sunshine Suzanne Sykes for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiff Kent Davis. (Attachments: #1 Part 1 to Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Request for Summons) (et) [Transferred from California Central on 8/17/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kent Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kula Kai View Estates, Community Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kula Kai View Estates Community Road Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randy Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawai'i
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hawaii County Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelden Waltgen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?