United States of America v. Marshall et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Camela J. Marshall, State of Hawaii - Department of Taxation, U.S. Bank, N.A. and The City and County of Honolulu
Case Number: 1:2023cv00360
Filed: August 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7403 Suit to Enforce Federal Tax Lien
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 27, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 27, 2023 Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint Exhibits "A"-"G"; Certificate of Service by State of Hawaii - Department of Taxation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Johiro, Cynthia)
October 25, 2023 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Reid M. Yamashiro on behalf of The City and County of Honolulu on behalf of The City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yamashiro, Reid)
October 24, 2023 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. U.S. Bank, N.A. served on 10/18/2023. (Uhalde, Matthew)
October 24, 2023 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. The City and County of Honolulu served on 10/6/2023. (Uhalde, Matthew)
October 24, 2023 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. State of Hawaii - Department of Taxation served on 10/6/2023. (Uhalde, Matthew)
October 24, 2023 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by United States of America. Camela J. Marshall served on 10/5/2023. (Uhalde, Matthew)
October 11, 2023 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by The City and County of Honolulu. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Yost, Moana)
October 3, 2023 Filing 14 EO: At the Government's request to allow more time to serve the defendants, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 10/30/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 12/14/2023 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 12/07/2023.Parties are to participate via telephone through our ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
August 29, 2023 Filing 13 Summons Issued as to The City and County of Honolulu. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to U.S. Bank, N.A. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to State of Hawaii - Department of Taxation. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 10 Summons Issued as to Camela J. Marshall. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 9 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 8 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
August 29, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 10/30/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/29/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00360 HG-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
August 29, 2023 Filing 5 Summons (Proposed) (Uhalde, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 4 Summons (Proposed) (Uhalde, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Uhalde, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Uhalde, Matthew)
August 29, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Enforce Judgment and Federal Tax Liens on Real Property against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Uhalde, Matthew) Modified on 8/29/2023. (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Marshall et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Harry Yee
Represented By: Matthew Uhalde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Camela J. Marshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii - Department of Taxation
Represented By: Cynthia M. Johiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The City and County of Honolulu
Represented By: Moana A. Yost
Represented By: Reid M. Yamashiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?