Al-Farouk v. State of Hawaii et al
Plaintiff: Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk
Defendant: State of Hawaii, Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, State of Hawaii, Jade Butay, Anne Perreira-Eustaquio, Debra Dawn and Governor Joshua Booth Green
Case Number: 1:2023cv00385
Filed: September 17, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 6, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 EO: In light of the #13 Order issued by District Judge Leslie E. Kobayashi allowing Plaintiff leave to file her second amended complaint by December 12, 2023, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/13/2023 IS CONTINUED TO 01/09/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 01/02/2024.Parties are to participate via telephone through our Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)COURTS CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
October 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: DISMISSING PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR VIOLATION OF CIVIL RIGHTS; GRANTING PLAINTIFF PARTIAL LEAVE TO FILE A SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT; AND RESERVING RULING ON PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS re #6 - Signed by JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI on 10/13/2023. Based on the foregoing, Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint for Violation of Civil Rights, filed September 28, 2023, is HEREBY DISMISSED. The dismissal is WITH PREJUDICE as to Plaintiff's claims against the State and DLIR, but the dismissal is WITHOUT PREJUDICE to the filing of a second amended complaint against Butay, Perreira-Eustaquio, Dawn, and Governor Green, in their individual and official capacities. Plaintiff is GRANTED leave to file her second amended complaint by December 12, 2023. The second amended complaint must comply with the terms of this Order. The Clerk's Office is DIRECTED to terminate the State and DLIR as parties on October 26, 2023, unless Plaintiff files a timely motion for reconsideration of this Order. Finally, the Court RESERVES RULING on Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs, filed September 18, 2023. If Plaintiff chooses to file a second amended complaint, and at least a portion of it survives the screening process, the merits of the Application will be addressed. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk was served electronically to the email address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on October 13, 2023. Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF).
October 12, 2023 ADVISORY ENTRY. The entry docket numbers #11 Amended Complaint (entered as "Summons (Proposed)") and #12 Amended Complaint, filed by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk were filed incorrectly in this case. Please be advised that both docket entries contain documents previously filed in the instant case, see ECF Nos. #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference and #6 First Amended Complaint. The filing party shall refrain from reentering duplicate filings in this case. No further action necessary. (eta)
October 11, 2023 Filing 12 *** Duplicate Filing *** First AMENDED COMPLAINT Yasmeen Al-Farouk against Jade Butay, Debra Dawn, Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, State of Hawaii, Joshua Booth Green, Anne Perreira-Eustaquio, State of Hawaii, filed by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint, #2 Main Document Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Al-Farouk, Yasmeen) Modified on 10/12/2023 (eta).
October 11, 2023 Filing 11 *** Duplicate Filing *** Summons (Proposed) FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages for Damages (Violation of Federal Civil Rights, The Due Process Clause of the 14th Amendment of the United States Constitution (42 U.S.C. 1983), Hawaii Sovereign Immunity Waiver HRS 662-2 Negligence, Unemployment Insurance Fraud) against All Defendants - filed by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Complaint , #2 Main Document Rule 16 Scheduling Order)(Al-Farouk, Yasmeen) Modified on 10/12/2023 (eta).
October 2, 2023 Filing 10 EO: On September 29, 2023, Plaintiff filed an #8 Application for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing ("Application"). After carefully reviewing the Application, the Court finds that Plaintiff meets all the technical requirements for e-filing. The Court thus GRANTS the Application. Plaintiff shall submit the CM/ECF Registration Form to the Clerk's Office. Plaintiff is required to abide by all rules applicable to utilization of the Court's e-filing system. The Court reserves the right to revoke Plaintiff's e-filing privileges at any point. Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 10/02/2023. (kjm3)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Pro Se Plaintiff Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk ("Plaintiff") was served by First Class Mail to the following address: 784 Spotted Eagle Street, Henderson, NV 89015. Plaintiff was also served by email at osaasremote@gmail.com on October 2, 2023.
September 29, 2023 Filing 8 APPLICATION for Permission to Participate in Electronic Filing (E-File) - by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk (eta)
September 28, 2023 Filing 7 (Proposed) Summons for Jade Butay, DLIR Director re #6 Amended Complaint - submitted by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk. (Attachments: #1 (Proposed) Summons for Debra Dawn, DLIR Appeals Officer, #2 (Proposed) Summons for Gov. Joshua Green, #3 (Proposed) Summons for Anne Perreira-Eustaquio)(eta)
September 28, 2023 Filing 6 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for Damages (Violation of Federal Civil Rights, The Due Process Clause of the 14th Amendment of the United States Constitution (42 U.S.C. 1983), Hawaii Sovereign Immunity Waiver HRS 662-2 Negligence, Unemployment Insurance Fraud) against All Defendants - filed by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk.(eta)
September 18, 2023 Filing 5 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk (eta)
September 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/13/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/17/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk was served by email was served by email at osaasremote@gmail.com on September 18, 2023.
September 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DEFICIENCY ORDER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/17/2023. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk was served by email at osaasremote@gmail.com on September 18, 2023. A blank Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs blank and a file-stamped copy of the Complaint were included in the email to Plaintiff.
September 17, 2023 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk. (eta)
September 17, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Violation of Civil Rights against All Defendants - filed by Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Al-Farouk v. State of Hawaii et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yasmeen H. Al-Farouk
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Labor and Industrial Relations, State of Hawaii
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jade Butay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anne Perreira-Eustaquio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Dawn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Governor Joshua Booth Green
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?