Manning v. Intrepid, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lina Manning
Defendant: Intrepid, Inc., Iruka Hawaii LLC and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 1:2023cv00387
Filed: September 19, 2023
Court: US District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Referring Judge: ROM TRADER
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 18, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 18, 2023 Filing 11 EO: In light of [ECF #10 ] Order Approving Stipulation Re Stay in View of the Pending Limitation of Liability Act Action, filed on 10/17/2023, the Court VACATES the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 11/20/2023 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Trader. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER)(rt2)
October 17, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION RE STAY IN VIEW OF THE PENDING LIMITATION OF LIABILITY ACT ACTION - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 10/17/2023. Considering the Parties' stipulation, ECF No. 9, this case is stayed pending the lifting of the injunction and monition in In Re Iruka Hawaii LLC et al., 23-cv-00184-JAO-WRP. No answer is due by Defendants unless and until the stay is lifted. (jni)
October 17, 2023 Filing 9 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, by Intrepid, Inc., Iruka Hawaii LLC. (Schultz, Pamela)
September 20, 2023 Filing 8 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
September 19, 2023 Filing 7 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
September 19, 2023 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of Service of Summons)(eta)
September 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 11/20/2023 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE ROM TRADER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/19/2023. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
September 19, 2023 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Intrepid, Inc., Iruka Hawaii LLC. (eta)
September 19, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 23-00387 JAO-RT on all further pleadings. (eta)
September 19, 2023 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Easley, Preston)
September 19, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT For Damages and Demand for Jury Trial; Summons against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AHIDC-2896014.), filed by Lina Manning. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Notice of Interested Parties)(Easley, Preston)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Manning v. Intrepid, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lina Manning
Represented By: Preston W. Easley, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Intrepid, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Iruka Hawaii LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?