Frank v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Plaintiff: Leah Frank
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company and Does 1-5
Case Number: 1:2024cv00180
Filed: April 19, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 31, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 31, 2024 Filing 19 EO: In light of Mr. Miller's #18 Letter of request, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/17/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 08/01/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 07/25/2024.Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
May 31, 2024 Filing 18 LETTER from Richard B. Miller dated May 23, 2024 regarding a continuance on the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (bbb)
May 16, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE (ECF NO. #16 ) AS TO R. MARTIN WEBER, JR., ESQ. re #16 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/16/2024. (eta)
May 16, 2024 Filing 16 First MOTION to Amend/Correct #15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of R. Martin Weber, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3003777. Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric) Modified on 5/16/2024 (eta).
May 16, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of R. Martin Weber, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3003777.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric)
May 3, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Leah Frank. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company served on 4/29/2024. (Ferrer, Eric)
April 26, 2024 Filing 13 EO: The Court has carefully reviewed the #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Martin Weber, Jr. ("Motion"). In the Declaration of R. Martin Weber, Jr. attached to the Motion, Mr. Weber attests that he has "filed a pro hac application for Los Angeles Superior Court. The judge pointed out some deficiencies in [Mr. Weber's] application, and denied the application without prejudice to refiling. [Mr. Weber] corrected the deficiencies, refiled the application, and it is set for hearing on May 6, 2024." ECF No. #10 at 2. The Court DIRECTS Plaintiff to file an amended Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to R. Martin Weber, Jr. indicating the Los Angeles Superior Court's ruling on Mr. Weber's amended pro hac vice application. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm3)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRIANNA J. STRANGE, ESQ. re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/26/2024. (eta)
April 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO BRIAN R. STRANGE, ESQ. re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 4/26/2024. (eta)
April 25, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of R. Martin Weber, Jr. Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993955.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric)
April 25, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice of Brianna Strange Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993946.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric)
April 25, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Brian Strange Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-2993923.Eric G. Ferrer, I appearing for Plaintiff Leah Frank (Ferrer, Eric)
April 19, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (jni)
April 19, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
April 19, 2024 Filing 5 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet - Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure (Attachments: #1 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(jni)
April 19, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/17/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/19/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
April 19, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00180 LEK-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
April 19, 2024 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Ferrer, Eric)
April 19, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT; Jury Trial Demanded against Does 1-5, State Farm Fire and Casualty Company ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2990698.), filed by Leah Frank. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Insurance Declarations and Endorsements Page, #2 Exhibit B - Rental Condominium Unitowners Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ferrer, Eric) Modified on 4/19/2024 (jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leah Frank
Represented By: Eric G. Ferrer, I
Represented By: Brian R. Strange
Represented By: Brianna J. Strange
Represented By: R. Martin Weber, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?