Nautilus Insurance Company v. The Kona Sailing Club et al
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Defendant: Kona Sailing Club, The, Alicia Starsong and Daniel Starsong
Case Number: 1:2024cv00201
Filed: April 30, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgement
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 26, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Alicia Starsong served on 6/4/2024. (Wagner, Wayne)
June 26, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Daniel Starsong served on 6/4/2024. (Wagner, Wayne)
June 26, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Nautilus Insurance Company. Kona Sailing Club, The served on 6/17/2024. (Wagner, Wayne)
May 28, 2024 Filing 11 EO: In order to allow time for service, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from 6/25/2024 to 8/12/2024 at 9:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo)
April 30, 2024 Filing 10 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
April 30, 2024 Filing 9 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
April 30, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 6/25/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 4/30/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
April 30, 2024 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Starsong, Alicia Starsong. (eta)
April 30, 2024 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Kona Sailing Club, The. (eta)
April 30, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00201 LEK-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
April 30, 2024 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Wagner, Wayne) Modified on 5/3/2024 to add Admiral Insurance Company, Berkley Insurance Company, Signet Star Holdings, Inc. and W.R. Berkley Corporation as corporate parent/other affiliate (eta).
April 30, 2024 Filing 3 Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne)
April 30, 2024 Filing 2 Summons (Proposed) (Wagner, Wayne)
April 30, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY JUDGMENT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-2995892.), filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wagner, Wayne)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Nautilus Insurance Company v. The Kona Sailing Club et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Wayne R. Wagner
Represented By: Deborah Ann DiCristofaro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kona Sailing Club, The
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alicia Starsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Starsong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?