Fiedler v. ID.me
Plaintiff: David Wescott Fiedler
Defendant: ID.me
Case Number: 1:2024cv00209
Filed: May 6, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: LESLIE E KOBAYASHI
Referring Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 552 Right to Privacy Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2024 Filing 11 EO: COURT ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO DISMISS, [FILED 5/17/24 (DKT. NO. 10)] (JUDGE LESLIE E. KOBAYASHI)(shm)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
May 17, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Dismiss - by Plaintiff David Wescott Fiedler (eta)
May 14, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed by David Wescott Fiedler. ID.me served on 5/9/2024. (eta)
May 7, 2024 Filing 8 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 7 Pro Se Consent to Receive Documents and Notice of Electronic Filings by Email - by David Wescott Fiedler (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
May 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/1/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/6/2024. A copy of the order was given to the Plaintiff at the time of filing. (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to ID.me. (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 3 Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number 3197 re #1 Complaint (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet - by David Wescott Fiedler. (eta)
May 6, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for a Civil Case against ID.me - filed by David Wescott Fiedler.(eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Fiedler v. ID.me
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Wescott Fiedler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ID.me
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?