Park v. Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Plaintiff: David Park
Defendant: Insurance Corporation of British Columbia a provincial crown corporation in British Columbia doing business as ICBC
Case Number: 1:2024cv00222
Filed: May 23, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: JILL A OTAKE
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2024 Filing 31 REPLY PLAINTIFF DAVID PARKS REPLY TO DEFENDANT INSURANCE CORPORATION OF BRITISH COLUMBIA DBA ICBCS MEMORANDUM IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Park. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE)(Glenn, James)
July 15, 2024 Filing 30 REPLY Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia DBA ICBC's Reply Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative, Compel Arbitration; Declaration of Brenda Adlem; Certificate of Service filed by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Brenda Adlem, #2 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service)(Germany, Jessica)
July 8, 2024 Filing 29 AMENDED MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and in the Alternative Compel Arbitration PLAINTIFF DAVID PARKS FIRST AMENDED OPPOSITION TO [DKT. 20] DEFENDANT INSURANCE CORPORATION OF BRITISH COLUMBIA DBA ICBCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF JAMES C. GLENN; EXHIBITS 1 - 4; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Park. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James C. Glenn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Certificate of Service)(Glenn, James) Modified on 7/10/2024 (jni)
July 8, 2024 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Dismiss and in the Alternative Compel Arbitration PLAINTIFF DAVID PARKS OPPOSITION TO [DKT. 20] DEFENDANT INSURANCE CORPORATION OF BRITISH COLUMBIA DBA ICBCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND IN THE ALTERNATIVE COMPEL ARBITRATION; DECLARATION OF JAMES C. GLENN; EXHIBIT 1; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by David Park. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of James C. Glenn, #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Certificate of Service)(Glenn, James)
July 8, 2024 Filing 27 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #22 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF JAMES C. GLENN; EXHIBITS 1-2; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jessica M. Germany, #2 Exhibit "A", #3 Certificate of Service)(Germany, Jessica)
July 2, 2024 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by David Park CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE RE: PLAINTIFFS RULE 26 INITIAL DISCLOSURES (Glenn, James)
July 1, 2024 ADVISORY ENTRY-Incorrect Attorney Filer- Please be advised that Document #25 Initial Disclosure, was signed by an attorney other than the one identified as the e-filer. The name of the CM/ECF User under whose login and password the document is being electronically filed must correspond to the signature of the attorney signing the CM/ECF filed document. No further action is necessary on filer's part. (jni)
June 28, 2024 Filing 25 INITIAL DISCLOSURE by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Germany, Jessica)
June 25, 2024 Filing 24 EO: In light of the #22 PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/26/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 09/11/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 09/04/2024.Parties are directed to review Rule 10.3 of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii regarding requirements for Mandatory Chambers Copies. Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 24, 2024 Filing 23 NOTICE of Hearing on Motions: #20 Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia dba ICBC's Motion to Dismiss and in the Alternative Compel Arbitration; and #22 Plaintiff's Motion to Remand.Motions Hearing is set for 8/9/2024 at 9:00 AM in Aha Kanawai before JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE. Opposition due on 7/8/24, Reply due on 7/15/24. (shm)
June 21, 2024 Filing 22 MOTION to Remand to State Court PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR AN ORDER OF REMAND; MEMORANDUM IN SUPPORT OF MOTION; DECLARATION OF JAMES C. GLENN; EXHIBITS 1-2; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE James C. Glenn, IV appearing for Plaintiff David Park (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of James C. Glenn, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Certificate of Service)(Glenn, James)
June 21, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE of Dismissal PLAINTIFF DAVID PARKS NOTICE OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE OF DEFENDANT GORDON I. ITO, as Insurance Commissioner, State of Hawaii; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE David Park. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Glenn, James)
June 21, 2024 Filing 20 MOTION to Dismiss and in the Alternative Compel Arbitration Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Kirandeep Dhaliwal, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Certificate of Service)(Germany, Jessica)
June 20, 2024 Filing 19 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Germany, Jessica)
June 18, 2024 Filing 18 EO: Due to a conflict in the Court's schedule, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 06/24/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 06/26/2024 at 11:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements, if not already filed, are due by 06/19/2024.Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 18, 2024 Filing 17 EO: For all hearings set before Magistrate Judge Kenneth J. Mansfield: Parties are directed to review Rule 10.3 of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii regarding requirements for Mandatory Chambers Copies. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 17, 2024 Filing 16 Scheduling Conference Statement PLAINTIFFS SCHEDULING CONFERENCE STATEMENT; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Bickerton, James)
June 17, 2024 Filing 15 REPORT of Planning Meeting PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS JOINT REPORT OF THE PARTIES PLANNING MEETING; CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. (Bickerton, James)
June 17, 2024 Filing 14 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia identifying Corporate Parent Insurance Corporation of British Columbia for Insurance Corporation of British Columbia.. (Germany, Jessica)
June 12, 2024 Filing 13 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MARK PRESTON SCHEER re #6 , #8 , #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/29/2024.Attorney Mark Preston Scheer added Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia.(jni)
May 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING AMENDED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JENNIFER LYNN CROW re #5 , #7 , #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 5/29/2024.Attorney Jennifer Lynn Crow added Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (jni)
May 29, 2024 Filing 10 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #8 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007192. Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica)
May 29, 2024 Filing 9 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #7 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007165. Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica)
May 28, 2024 Filing 8 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007192. Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica)
May 28, 2024 Filing 7 Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct #5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007165. Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica)
May 24, 2024 Filing 6 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Mark Preston Scheer, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007192.Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica) Modified on 5/28/2024 (jni)
May 24, 2024 Filing 5 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Jennifer Lynn Crow, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3007165.Jessica Morgan Germany appearing for Defendant Insurance Corporation of British Columbia (Germany, Jessica) Modified on 5/28/2024 (jni)
May 24, 2024 Filing 4 EO: The parties are directed to review the General Civil Case Procedures Before Judge Otake posted on the court's website and are expected to comply with the most recent version that is posted. (JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE)(shm)
May 23, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 6/24/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 5/23/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
May 23, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00222 JAO-KJM on all further pleadings. (jni)
May 23, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia from Circuit Court of the First Circuit, case number 1CCV-24-0000258. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3006647), filed by Insurance Corporation of British Columbia. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Certificate of Service, #4 Civil Cover Sheet)(Germany, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Park v. Insurance Corporation of British Columbia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Park
Represented By: James C. Glenn, IV
Represented By: James J. Bickerton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Insurance Corporation of British Columbia a provincial crown corporation in British Columbia doing business as ICBC
Represented By: Mark Preston Scheer
Represented By: Mark Preston Scheer
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Crow
Represented By: Jennifer Lynn Crow
Represented By: Jessica Morgan Germany
Represented By: Stephen G. Dyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?