Brian A. Carter, Inc. v. Smith et al
Plaintiff: Brian A. Carter and Brian A. Carter, Inc.
Defendant: John Does 1-99, T. Crown Holdings III, Inc., Doe Governmental Units 1-10, Rourke Smith, CVS Health Corporation, Scott M. Coffey, Jane Does 1-99, Doe Entities 1-20, CVS Realty Co. and T. Crown West, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2024cv00271
Filed: June 25, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. § 1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Hearing on #15 Plaintiffs' Motion to Remand to State Court and #17 Defendant CVS Health Corporation's Motion to Compel Arbitration is set for October 11, 2024 at 9:00 a.m. in Aha Kupono before CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON. Briefing on the motions shall be in accordance with Local Rule 7.2. (tyk)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO ELIZABETH Z. MERAZ, ESQ. re #11 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/25/2024. (eta)
July 24, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION to Compel Arbitration Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Defendant CVS Health Corporation (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 Declaration of Thomas S. Moffatt, #3 Declaration of Lauren A. Grosso, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Exhibit B, #6 Exhibit C, #7 Exhibit D, #8 Exhibit E, #9 Certificate of Compliance Pursuant to LR7.8, #10 Certificate of Service)(Chin, Douglas)
July 24, 2024 Filing 16 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brian A. Carter, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(del Castillo, Rafael)
July 24, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION to Remand to State Court Rafael G. del Castillo appearing for Plaintiff Brian A. Carter, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum in support of motion, #2 Declaration Declaration of Brian A. Carter, RPh, #3 Declaration Declaration of Rafael del Castillo, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 1: Governing Contract, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 2: correspondence, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 3: correspondence, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 4: correspondence, #8 Exhibit Exhibit 5: correspondence, #9 Exhibit Exhibit 6: Installment Note, #10 Certificate of Service)(del Castillo, Rafael)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO SETH A. HORVATH, ESQ. re #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/24/2024. (eta)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO KEVIN SHEA, ESQ. re #9 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/24/2024. (eta)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO JONATHAN ASSIA, ESQ. re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 7/24/2024. (eta)
July 24, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to Elizabeth Z. Meraz] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3032279.Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Defendant CVS Health Corporation (Chin, Douglas)
July 24, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to Seth A. Horvath] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3032112.Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Defendant CVS Health Corporation (Chin, Douglas)
July 24, 2024 Filing 9 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to Kevin Shea] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3032059.Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Defendant CVS Health Corporation (Chin, Douglas)
July 24, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice [as to Jonathan Assia] Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3032053.Douglas S.G. Chin appearing for Defendant CVS Health Corporation (Chin, Douglas)
July 10, 2024 Filing 7 EO: By joint agreement to allow the parties to (i) brief a motion to remand, (ii) serve the remaining defendants, and (iii) brief a motion to compel arbitration, prior to conducting the scheduling conference in this matter, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 07/29/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 09/27/2024 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling Conference Statements are due by 09/20/2024. Parties are directed to review Rule 10.3 of the Local Rules of Practice for the United States District Court for the District of Hawaii regarding requirements for Mandatory Chambers Copies. Parties are to participate via telephone through the Courts Zoom Teleconference. Call-in information for this hearing is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(bbb)
June 26, 2024 Filing 6 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
June 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 7/29/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 6/26/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
June 26, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00271 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
June 25, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by CVS Health Corporation. (Chin, Douglas)
June 25, 2024 Filing 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet by CVS Health Corporation. (Chin, Douglas)
June 25, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by CVS Health Corporation from Circuit Court of the Fifth Circuit, State of Hawaii, case number 5CCV-24-0000053. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3019542), filed by CVS Health Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Douglas S. Chin, #2 Declaration of Thomas S. Moffatt, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C, #6 Exhibit D, #7 Certificate of Service)(Chin, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brian A. Carter, Inc. v. Smith et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Crown Holdings III, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Governmental Units 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rourke Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Seth A. Horvath
Represented By: Seth A. Horvath
Represented By: Kevin Shea
Represented By: Kevin Shea
Represented By: Jonathan Assia
Represented By: Jonathan Assia
Represented By: Elizabeth Z. Meraz
Represented By: Elizabeth Z. Meraz
Represented By: John Kelly
Represented By: Douglas S.G. Chin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott M. Coffey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jane Does 1-99
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doe Entities 1-20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Realty Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Crown West, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Carter
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Michael Curtis Biechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian A. Carter, Inc.
Represented By: Rafael G. del Castillo
Represented By: Michael Curtis Biechler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?