Korda v. Kobayashi
Plaintiff: Victoria R. Korda
Defendant: Leslie Kobayashi
Case Number: 1:2024cv00311
Filed: July 24, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE PURSUANT TO PLAINTIFF'S AS-CONSTRUED NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL re #10 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/11/2024. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Victoria R. Korda shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on September 12, 2024.
September 6, 2024 Filing 10 Ex Parte MOTION to Close (Tax Audit Purposed); Certificate of Service - by Plaintiff Victoria R. Korda (eta)
August 21, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER (1) GRANTING APPLICATION TO PROCEED IN DISTRICT COURT WITHOUT PREPAYING FEES OR COSTS; AND (2) DISMISSING COMPLAINT WITH LEAVE TO AMEND re #1 , #5 , #8 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 8/21/2024. Korda may have until September 6, 2024 to file a SAC. The Court cautions Korda that failure to file a SAC, consistent with the guidance in this Order, by that date will result in the automatic dismissal of this action without prejudice or further notice. The Clerk of Court is DIRECTED to serve Korda with a copy of the form "Pro Se 2" "Complaint and Request for Injunction." (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Victoria R. Korda has been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on August 21, 2024. A copy of "Pro Se 2" "Complaint and Request for Injunction" has been included in the mailing to Plaintiff.
August 19, 2024 Filing 8 APPLICATION to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs - by Plaintiff Victoria R. Korda (eta)
August 1, 2024 Filing 7 Mail returned to the Clerk's Office by Victoria R. Korda re : ECF No. #1 Complaint with the following notation: "(please amend complaint)", #2 Deficiency Order with the following notations: "(please amend complaint)", "fraud", and "default order", blank IFP Application with the following notation: "fraud inquiry" and #3 Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. (Attachments: #1 copy of ECF No. 1 - Complaint, #2 copy of ECF No. 2 - Deficiency Order, #3 copy of blank IFP Application, #4 copy of ECF No. 3 - Order Setting Rule 16 Scheduling Conference) (eta)
August 1, 2024 Filing 6 NOTICE of Non-Appearance at 9/23/2024 Hearing Due to Medical Reasons - by Victoria R. Korda. (eta)
July 29, 2024 Filing 5 (AMENDED) COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Leslie Kobayashi - filed by Victoria R. Korda. The complaint is captioned with case number, CV 24-00109 LEK-WRP. (eta)
July 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL - Signed by JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE on 7/25/2024. JUDGE JILL A. OTAKE recused. Case reassigned to CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON for all further proceedings. Please reflect new Civil case number CV 24-00311 DKW-WRP on all further filings.COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Victoria R. Korda shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on 7/26/2024. (jni)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/23/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/24/2024. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Victoria R. Korda shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the (NEF) on 7/25/2024. (jni)
July 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 2 DEFICIENCY ORDER re #1 - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/24/2024. COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Victoria R. Korda shall be served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the (NEF) on 7/25/2024. Additionally, a blank Application for IFP form shall be included in the mailing to Plaintiff.(jni)
July 24, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTION against Leslie Kobayashi - filed by Victoria R. Korda.(jni)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Korda v. Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victoria R. Korda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Leslie Kobayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?