Moffett, II v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Plaintiff: William B. Moffett, II
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Case Number: 1:2024cv00314
Filed: July 26, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: HELEN GILLMOR
Referring Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Breach of Contract
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 3, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 RULE 16 SCHEDULING ORDER - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 9/3/2024. (adi)
September 3, 2024 Filing 17 EP: RULE 16 SCHEDULING CONFERENCE hearing held.Rachel Zelman and Max Compton appeared on behalf of Plaintiff.Ashley Shibuya appeared on behalf of Defendant.The Court held a Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference. Dates Given. A Rule 16 Scheduling Order to be issued.Jury Selection/Trial is set for 12/2/2025 at 9:00 AM in before DISTRICT JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Final Pretrial Conference is set for 11/20/2025 at 10:30 AM before DISTRICT JUDGE HELEN GILLMOR. Telephonic Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Settlement Conference #2 is set for 8/5/2025 at 1:00 PM by Video Conference (VTC) before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Dispositive Motions filed by 7/2/2025. Discovery due by 7/2/2025.Other Matters:An Early Settlement Conference is set for December 3, 2024 at 10:00 AM by VTC before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter. The Court will provide details regarding VTC access prior to the conference date. Confidential Settlement Statements shall be emailed to porter_orders@hid.uscourts.gov by November 26, 2024.The parties are directed to consult Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter's Standing Order Regarding Settlement Conferences, available on the Court's public website, regarding the format of the confidential settlement conference statement and settlement conference procedures.Telephonic hearings before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter, will be held via Zoom Dial:1-833-568-8864/ Meeting ID:161 0084 2470. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.(adi)
August 30, 2024 Filing 16 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Initial Disclosures (Miller, Robert)
August 29, 2024 Filing 15 EO: Due to a conflict with the Court's schedule, the Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2024 is ADVANCED to 9/3/2024 at 9:00 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864 Meeting ID: 161 0084 2470 (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(rlfh)
August 28, 2024 Filing 14 Plaintiff's Scheduling Conference Statement . (Compton, William) Modified on 8/29/2024 (eta).
August 28, 2024 Filing 13 Scheduling Conference Statement . (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
August 14, 2024 Filing 12 REPORT of Planning Meeting Joint Report on Conference of the Parties; Certificate of Service. (Miller, Robert)
August 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE AS TO MAX COMPTON, ESQ. re #7 , #10 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 8/13/2024. (eta)
August 12, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice (Max Compton, Esq.) Filing fee $ 300, receipt number BHIDC-3040463.Rachel Anna Zelman appearing for Plaintiff William B. Moffett, II (Zelman, Rachel) Modified on 8/13/2024 (eta).
August 8, 2024 Filing 9 ANSWER to Complaint by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
August 7, 2024 Filing 8 EO: The Declaration of Counsel submitted in support of #7 Plaintiff's Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice does not contain complete information in Paragraph 7 regarding counsel's request to waive CM/ECF training. No later than 8/12/2024, counsel shall file an amended declaration. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER)(wrp1)
August 5, 2024 Filing 7 MOTION for Pro Hac Vice Appearance of Max Comtpon Filing fee $ 300, receipt number AHIDC-3037652.Rachel Anna Zelman appearing for Plaintiff William B. Moffett, II (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Zelman, Rachel)
July 29, 2024 Filing 6 Errata re #1 Notice of Removal, . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
July 29, 2024 Filing 5 Notice to Parties RE: Corporate Disclosure Statements - Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (jni)
July 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 9/4/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 7/29/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT.(jni)
July 29, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00314 HG-WRP on all further pleadings. (jni)
July 26, 2024 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company for State Farm Fire and Casualty Company.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)
July 26, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company from Circuit Court of the Second Circuit, case number 2CCV-24-0000488. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3033602), filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Certificate of Service)(Shibuya, Ashley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Moffett, II v. State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Robert W. Miller
Represented By: Richard B. Miller
Represented By: Ashley R. Shibuya
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William B. Moffett, II
Represented By: William M. Compton
Represented By: Rachel Anna Zelman
Represented By: Max Compton
Represented By: Max Compton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?