Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber
Case Number: 1:2024cv00423
Filed: September 27, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: KENNETH J MANSFIELD
Referring Judge: DERRICK K WATSON
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 20, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 20, 2024 Filing 11 EO: For good cause shown, the Court GRANTS #10 Plaintiff's Application for Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant and for Continuance of the Case Management Conference. Plaintiff's deadline to serve the Complaint and Summons is CONTINUED from 12/26/2024 to 03/16/2025. In addition, the Rule 16 Scheduling Conference previously set for 11/25/2024 IS CONTINUED TO 04/21/2025 at 9:30 a.m. before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD. Scheduling conference statements are due by 04/14/2025. Parties are to participate via telephone through the court's ZOOM Teleconference. Call-in information for this conference is below. Parties must connect to the conference at least five (5) minutes prior to the scheduled start time of the hearing.Dial in number is 1-833-568-8864Access Code: 160 8983 1896 IT IS SO ORDERED. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD)(kjm2)
November 18, 2024 Filing 10 MOTION to Continue (Plaintiff's Application for Extension of Time Within Which to Effectuate Service on John Doe Defendant and for Continuance of the Case Management Conference) Christian Kamau appearing for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Kamau, Christian) Modified on 11/19/2024 (eta).
November 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD on 11/5/2024. (jni)
October 25, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference Christian Kamau appearing for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kamau, Christian)
September 30, 2024 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright and a copy of #1 Complaint have been served by email to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office at 508filings@loc.gov on September 30, 2024. (eta)
September 27, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
September 27, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
September 27, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:30AM on 11/25/2024 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE KENNETH J. MANSFIELD - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 9/27/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
September 27, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00423 DKW-KJM on all further pleadings. (eta)
September 27, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Kamau, Christian)
September 27, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 9/30/2024 (eta).
September 27, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe Subscriber ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3058718.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 9/27/2024 (eta).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christian Kamau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?