Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber
Case Number: 1:2024cv00489
Filed: November 14, 2024
Court: U.S. District Court for the District of Hawaii
Presiding Judge: WES REBER PORTER
Referring Judge: J MICHAEL SEABRIGHT
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 101 Copyright Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFF'S APPLICATION FOR LEAVE TO SERVE A THIRD-PARTY SUBPOENA PRIOR TO A RULE 26(f) CONFERENCE re #8 - Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER on 11/26/2024. 8. The deadline to serve Doe Defendant is extended to March 24, 2025. 9. No later than February 24, 2025, Plaintiff shall file a Status Report regarding its efforts to identify Doe Defendant and amend its pleading. 10. The Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED from January 13, 2025, to April 22, 2025, at 8:30 a.m. before Magistrate Judge Wes Reber Porter via Zoom: Dial in number: 1-833-568-8864; Meeting ID: 1610084 2470. Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is CONTINUED to 08:30AM on 4/22/2025 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER. Status Report due by 2/24/2025. (eta)
November 22, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference (Application for Leave to Serve a Third-Party Subpoena Prior to a Rule 26(f) Conference) Christian Kamau appearing for Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C)(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 11/25/2024 (jni)
November 14, 2024 Filing 7 Notice to Parties Re: Corporate Disclosure Statements: Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 and Criminal Rule 12.4 both address the filing of Corporate Disclosure Statements. Both rules state A party must:(1) file the Rule 7.1(a) (or 12.4(a)) statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court, and (2) promptly file a supplemental statement upon a change in the information that the statement requires. (eta)
November 14, 2024 Filing 6 CIVIL Waiver of Service Packet ~ Notice to Parties Regarding Service Pursuant to Rule 4 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Attachments: #1 AO 398 Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of a Summons, #2 AO 399 Waiver of the Service of Summons)(eta)
November 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Setting Telephonic Rule 16 Scheduling Conference is set for 09:00AM on 1/13/2025 before MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER - Signed by CHIEF JUDGE DERRICK K. WATSON on 11/14/2024. ATTACH THE SCHEDULING ORDER TO THE INITIATING DOCUMENT (COMPLAINT/NOTICE OF REMOVAL). THE SCHEDULING ORDER MUST BE SERVED WITH THE DOCUMENT. (eta)
November 14, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE of Case Assignment: Please reflect Civil case number CV 24-00489 JMS-WRP on all further pleadings. (eta)
November 14, 2024 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Media Systems, LLC for Strike 3 Holdings, LLC.. (Kamau, Christian)
November 14, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE (Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright) by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 11/14/2024 (eta).
November 14, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Copyright Infringement; Demand for Jury Trial against John Doe Subscriber ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AHIDC-3078437.), filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Kamau, Christian) Modified on 11/14/2024 (eta).
November 14, 2024 COURT'S CERTIFICATE of Service - a copy of #2 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Copyright and a copy of #1 Complaint have been served by email to the Register of Copyrights, U.S. Copyright Office at 508filings@loc.gov on November 14, 2024. (eta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the U.S. Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Hawaii District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe Subscriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Christian Kamau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Subscriber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?